Levu v. Air Canada, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Levu
Defendant: Air Canada and Air Canada, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00703
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER,INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing.(DEFENDANT). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/26/2020. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/26/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/12/2020. (RMF)ctp
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/10/2020. (MKH)
June 10, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on June 10, 2020 by Thomas Levu as to Air Canada, Inc.. (Normand, Edmund)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford D. Kimbro on behalf of Air Canada, Inc. (Kimbro, Bradford)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Varner, III on behalf of Air Canada, Inc. (Varner, Joseph)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Air Canada, Inc.. (Wachter, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Wachter on behalf of Air Canada, Inc. (Wachter, Charles)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Thomas Levu. Related case(s): no (Normand, Edmund) Modified on 5/14/2020 (DMA).
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Thomas Levu. (Normand, Edmund)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/29/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/13/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/29/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/13/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/29/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 24, 2020 REFUND for payment. Case 6:20-cv-702 was deleted. Receipt number 113A-16733121 refunded in the amount of $ 400.00 paid to Alex Couch.. (NLC)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Air Canada, Inc. (SPM)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-703-Orl-78LRH. (SJB)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Canada, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16733123) filed by Thomas Levu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Phillips, Jacob) Modified text on 4/27/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levu v. Air Canada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Canada, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph H. Varner, III
Represented By: Bradford D. Kimbro
Represented By: Charles Wachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Levu
Represented By: Jacob Lawrence Phillips
Represented By: Edmund A. Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?