Stahlman v. U.S. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: John David Stahlman
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice, United States Attorneys Executive Off. and Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 6:2020cv00733
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER taking under advisement #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/16/2020. (RMN)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John David Stahlman. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John David Stahlman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(RDO)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Release of Requested Record(s) Pursuant to Movant's Freedom of Information Act Request; denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Request Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for a Civil Case, #2 Exhibit B - Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)) (RMN)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John David Stahlman. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(DMA)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/30/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/30/2020. (RMF)ctp
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John David Stahlman. (SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Release of Requested Record(s) Pursuant to Movant's Freedom of Information Act Request by John David Stahlman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-D)(SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stahlman v. U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Stahlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorneys Executive Off.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?