Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Torres
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC and Dish Network L.L.C.
Defendant: Edgardo Torres
Case Number: 6:2020cv00878
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 6/3/2020 by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC as to Edgardo Torres. (Boatman, James)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MDH)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2020. (MEH) ctp
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2020. (MEH) ctp
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2020. (MEH) ctp
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested person order by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH DBS Corporation for Dish Network L.L.C.; Corporate Parent DISH Technologies L.L.C., Corporate Parent Kudelski Corporate, Inc. for Nagrastar LLC.. (Boatman, James) Modified on 5/26/2020 (SPM).
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Edgardo Torres. (SPM)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-878-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edgardo Torres (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16837523) filed by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Boatman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?