In Re: Tupperware Brands Corporation Stockholder Derivative Litigation
Plaintiff: Robert Pacheco, Todd Bradrick, Louis Vallee and Joanna Hughes
Defendant: Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Richard T. Riley, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, M. Anne Szostak, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, Michael Poteshman, Angel R. Martinez, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Kriss Cloninger, III, Susan M. Cameron, Catherine A. Bertini, Tupperware Brands Corporation and Meg Crofton
Case Number: 6:2020cv00908
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of change of address by Jack Reise (Reise, Jack)
November 1, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of change of address by Stephen J. Oddo (Oddo, Stephen)
June 23, 2022 Filing 46 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:20-cv-00908-GAP-DAB. US Magistrate Judge Gregory J Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (LAB)
May 12, 2022 Filing 45 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #44 Order to show cause filed by Todd Bradrick, Joanna Hughes, Robert Pacheco, Louis Vallee. (Oddo, Stephen)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER for the parties to show cause why this case should not be dismissed and closed. Show Cause Response due by 5/23/2022. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/9/2022. (LAM)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/29/2021. (LAM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak. (Ducayet, James)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 Motion to Stay. The stay in this case will remain pending the disposition of any motion to dismiss the Consolidated Second Amended Complaint in In re Tupperware Brands Corp. Securities Litigation, No. 6:20-cv-00357. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/16/2021. (LAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak. (Ducayet, James)
November 19, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Lan B. Kennedy-Davis on behalf of Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak (Kennedy-Davis, Lan)
October 29, 2020 Case Stayed. (RDO)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #33 Defendants' Motion to Stay. This matter is stayed pending resolution of the Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. 70 and 71) in the Securities Class Action (6:20-cv-357). Plaintiffs may seek to lift the stay prior to resolution of the Motions to Dismiss if circumstances change. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/28/2020. (HMK)
October 2, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY in support of #33 MOTION to Stay filed by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak. (Ducayet, James) Modified on 10/5/2020 (RDO).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY. Defendants may file a reply of no more than six (6) pages within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/1/2020. (HMK)
September 30, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply brief in support of their Motion to Stay by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak. (Ducayet, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 25, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Stay filed by Todd Bradrick, Joanna Hughes, Robert Pacheco, Louis Vallee. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Oddo, Stephen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Stay by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ducayet, James)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants. Defendants must file their motion to stay by September 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/4/2020. (Presnell, Gregory)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #30 Amended Complaint And Conduct Case Management Conference by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak, Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Ducayet, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 30 VERIFIED CONSOLIDATED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Oddo, Stephen) Modified on 8/6/2020 (RDO).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Motion to extend time. The parties shall conduct the case management conference by September 4, 2020, and file their case management report by September 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 7/28/2020. (LAM)
July 28, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Case management report due by 9/11/2020 (RDO)
July 27, 2020 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Extension Of Time To Conduct Case Management Conference by Catherine A. Bertini, Susan M. Cameron, Kriss Cloninger, III, Meg Crofton, E.V. (Rick) Goings, Cassandra Harris, Angel R. Martinez, Antonio Monteiro de Castro, Christopher D O'Leary, David R. Parker, Michael Poteshman, Richard T. Riley, Joyce M. Roche, Patricia A. Stitzel, M. Anne Szostak, Tupperware Brands Corporation. (Ducayet, James)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR JAMES W. DUCAYET TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT; granting #26 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR JENNIFER M. WHEELER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/16/2020. (HMK)
July 15, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Jennifer M. Wheeler to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17061310 for $150 and Written Designation and Consent to Act by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Gerber, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 15, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for James W. Ducayet to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17061148 for $150 and Written Designation and Consent to Act by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Gerber, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, WRITTEN DESIGNATION, AND CONSENT TO ACT; granting #22 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, WRITTEN DESIGNATION, AND CONSENT TO ACT; and granting #23 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, WRITTEN DESIGNATION, AND CONSENT TO ACT, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/8/2020. (MB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Eric M. Carrino to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17031342 for $150 by Todd Bradrick, Joanna Hughes, Louis Vallee. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Stephen J. Oddo to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17031311 for $150 by Todd Bradrick, Joanna Hughes, Louis Vallee. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 8, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Brian J. Robbins to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17031251 for $150 by Todd Bradrick, Joanna Hughes, Louis Vallee. (Attachments: #1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS, APPOINTING LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS, EFFECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND SETTING SCHEDULE. Case Number 6:20-cv-953-31-GJK shall be consolidated with Case Number 6:20-cv-908-31-GJK. All subsequent papers, pleadings, and motions shall be filed in the Consolidated Action in 20-cv-908-31-GJK which will be recaptioned "In re Tupperware Brands Corporation Stockholder Derivative Litigation". The Clerk is directed to administratively close 6:20-cv-00953-31-GJK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/6/2020. (HMK)
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Consolidating the Related Stockholder Derivative Actions, Appointing Lead and Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, Effecting Service of Process and Setting Schedule by Todd Bradrick, Louis Vallee, Joanna Hughes. (Reise, Jack) Modified on 6/30/2020 (RDO).
June 15, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by all Defendants. (RDO)
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #18) NOTICE by Tupperware Brands Corporation (Gerber, Daniel) Modified on 6/15/2020 (RDO).
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by all Defendants. Related cases: yes. (Gerber, Daniel) Modified on 6/15/2020 (RDO).
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/02/2020 by Robert Pacheco as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Martinez Waiver of Service, #2 Main Document Szostak Waiver of Service, #3 Main Document Bertini Waiver of Service, #4 Main Document Cameron Waiver of Service, #5 Main Document Cloninger Waiver of Service, #6 Main Document Crofton Waiver of Service, #7 Main Document de Castro Waiver of Service, #8 Main Document Goings Waiver of Service, #9 Main Document Harris Waiver of Service, #10 Main Document O'Leary Waiver of Service, #11 Main Document Parker Waiver of Service, #12 Main Document Poteshman Waiver of Service, #13 Main Document Riley Waiver of Service, #14 Main Document Roche Waiver of Service, #15 Main Document Stitzel Waiver of Service)(Komlossy, Emily)
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-908-ORL-31GJK. Judge Wendy W. Berger, Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #6 Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency: It is ORDERED that this case is transferred to the Honorable Judge Gregory A. Presnell, under Local Rule 1.04(b), with his consent, for consideration with related cases. Additionally, under Local Rule 1.04(c), the Clerk is directed to reassign Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly to this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 6/3/2020. (RMF)ctp
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Robert Pacheco. (Komlossy, Emily)
June 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Gustavo F. Bruckner, Samuel J. Adams, appearing on behalf of Robert Pacheco (Filing fee $300.00 receipt number ORL091205.) Related document: #4 MOTION for Gustavo F. Bruckner to appear pro hac vice , #5 MOTION for Samuel J. Adams to appear pro hac vice . (JVS)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 & #5 Plaintiff's Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/2/2020. (JLE)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp (PML).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/29/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/12/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/29/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/29/2020. (RMF)ctp
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert Pacheco. Related case(s): yes (Komlossy, Emily)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Samuel J. Adams to appear pro hac vice by Robert Pacheco. (Komlossy, Emily) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Gustavo F. Bruckner to appear pro hac vice by Robert Pacheco. (Komlossy, Emily) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KNC)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-908-Orl-78EJK. (SJB)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16849199) filed by Robert Pacheco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Proposed Summons, #17 Proposed Summons, #18 Client Verification)(Komlossy, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Tupperware Brands Corporation Stockholder Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pacheco
Represented By: Emily C. Komlossy
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Gustavo F. Bruckner
Represented By: Jack Reise
Represented By: Samuel J. Adams
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Bradrick
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Eric M. Carrino
Represented By: Brian J Robbins
Represented By: Jack Reise
Represented By: Benny C Goodman, III
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Travis E. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Vallee
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Eric M. Carrino
Represented By: Brian J Robbins
Represented By: Jack Reise
Represented By: Benny C Goodman, III
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Travis E. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Hughes
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Represented By: Eric M. Carrino
Represented By: Brian J Robbins
Represented By: Jack Reise
Represented By: Benny C Goodman, III
Represented By: Erik W. Luedeke
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Travis E. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D O'Leary
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Parker
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Riley
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Monteiro de Castro
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Anne Szostak
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce M. Roche
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Stitzel
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Poteshman
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel R. Martinez
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.V. (Rick) Goings
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Harris
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kriss Cloninger, III
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Cameron
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Bertini
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tupperware Brands Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meg Crofton
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: James W. Ducayet
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wheeler
Represented By: Lan B. Kennedy-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?