Steven L. Steward & Associates, P.A. v. Truist Bank et al
Plaintiff: Steven L. Steward & Associates, P.A.
Defendant: Truist Bank and Truist Financial Corporation
Case Number: 6:2020cv01083
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Steven L. Steward & Associates, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-CARES Act Section 1102 Lender Agreement , #2 Exhibit B-Fee Disclosure and Compensation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-Borrower Application Form)(Phillips, Jacob) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ARJ).
August 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 6, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Terrence M. White. (Normand, Edmund)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (emailed mediator) (MEJ)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 9/7/2020, Discovery due by 11/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2021, Pretrial statement due by 3/22/2022, All other motions due by 3/29/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/1/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/1/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 11/14/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/21/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
July 17, 2020 Set/reset deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 8/13/2020 (RDO)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 8/13/2020. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/16/2020. (JBS)
July 15, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint by Steven L. Steward & Associates, P.A.. (Normand, Edmund) Modified on 7/16/2020 (MEJ).
July 14, 2020 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rottmann, Emily)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY CHERYL L. HAAS AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02; granting #15 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY M. LAUGHLIN ALLEN AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02; granting #16 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY KATHRYN M. BARBER AND DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 2.02, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/10/2020. (MB)
July 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rottmann, Emily)
July 9, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Kathryn M. Barber to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17039479 for $150 by Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Rottmann, Emily) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 9, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for M. Laughlin Allen to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17039469 for $150 by Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Rottmann, Emily) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Cheryl L. Haas to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17039440 for $150 by Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Rottmann, Emily) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Steven L. Steward & Associates, P.A.. (Normand, Edmund)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank.. (Rottmann, Emily)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corporation. Related case(s): yes (Rottmann, Emily)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #6 Related Case Order by Steven L. Steward & Associates, P.A.. Related case(s): no (Normand, Edmund) Modified on 7/9/2020 (ARJ).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/11/2020. (HMK) Modified on 6/25/2020 (MEJ).
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: Local Rule 4.04(b) requires Plaintiff to file for a determination under Fed. R. Civ. P 23(c)(1) as to whether the case is to be maintained as a class action within ninety (90) days following the filing of the initial complaint. The Court recognizes that the timeframe prescribed in Rule 4.04(b) is abbreviated and therefore waives this deadline. The parties are DIRECTED to confer regarding deadlines pertinent to a motion for class certification and advise the Court of agreeable deadlines in their case management report. The deadlines should include a deadline for (1) disclosure of expert reports - class action, plaintiff and defendant; (2) discovery - class action; (3) motion for class certification; (4) response to motion for class certification; and (5) reply to response to motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/24/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/24/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/24/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
June 22, 2020 Reset deadlines: for Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corporation. Answer due by 7/9/2020. (ALL)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSIONOF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/22/2020. (HMK)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal /Complaint by Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corporation. (Rottmann, Emily)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank.. (Rottmann, Emily)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1083-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit, Orange County Florida, case number 2020-ca-005359 filed in State Court on 5/21/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16957030 filed by Truist Financial Corporation, Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit Florida Department of State Records, #3 Exhibit North Carolina Secretary of State Records, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas Hughes, Jr., #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rottmann, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven L. Steward & Associates, P.A. v. Truist Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L. Steward & Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Jacob Lawrence Phillips
Represented By: Edmund A. Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Represented By: Kathryn Margaret Barber
Represented By: Cheryl L. Haas
Represented By: M. Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Financial Corporation
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Represented By: Kathryn Margaret Barber
Represented By: Cheryl L. Haas
Represented By: M. Laughlin Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?