Calloway et al v. Waste Pro USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: WESNY LOUIME, NATHAN L CHANDLER, ANTONIO SANDERS, SEAN MCKINNEY, GEORGE DAVIS, BRESHAND HARRIS, BRYAN RICHARDSON, MARCOS RODRIGUEZ, ABNER CALLOWAY, ALBERT MORELAND, MARLON JACKSON, RAY WOLFORK, DAMIEN IRVEN, HOLIJIU ONONIWU, DARRELL DAVIS, MELVIN WILLIAMS, AUDREAUS SOL, LUIS IRIZARRY, KACEY YATES, CHANSELOR GORDON, ALEXANDER GONZALEZ, GEORGE SMITH, ENOCH MITCHELL, WILKIE JEWETT JR.,, DONALD REED, KEYVUS BRYANT, ANTROINE LANE, ANDREW BLACK, PAUL SEPULVEDA, JIMMY BAILEY, DARNELL MCCURDY, TYLER KIRKLAND, EDWIN RODRIGUEZ, FARDENS PIERRE LOUISSAINT, VIRGIL WARREN, LINCON CAMPBELL, LEAENARD TOSEN III, MONTARI LEONARD, JOSEPH WILLIAMS, HAROLD FIELDS, FREDRICK BRINSON, DELARRIAN STALLWORTH, MARCUS SMOTHERS, TERRY MITCHELL, JASON VALENTINE, FRANK WEATHER JR.,, DAVID RICE, LARRY BROWN, ANTONIO HALE, LEWIS CARTER, DUANE WILSON, PRINCE FRALEY, MARCOS COATES, JAMES CRAYTON, RANDAL HAYES, ANDREW LOUISSANT, YASMANY MONTALVO, MICHAEL LYONS, NATHANIEL MOORE III, JOHNATHAN MILLS, EDDIE MAY, LUIS ANTONIO MARTINEZ, Leaenard Tosen, III, Wilkie Jewett, Jr., Frank Weather, Jr., Luis Irizarry Nazario, Nathaniel Moore, III, Nathan Chandler and Jonathan Mills
Defendant: WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC., WASTE PRO USA, INC and Waste Pro USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01097
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 TRANSFER to Tampa Division and assigned case number 8:20-cv-1656-T-36AAS (ARJ)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Charlene E. Honeywell, in the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division, for consideration with Case No. 8:17-cv-2254-T-36CPT. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/27/2020. (MEH) ctp
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Waste Pro USA, Inc. by Waste Pro USA, Inc..(Tingley, Amy)
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Waste Pro of Florida, Inc. by Waste Pro USA, Inc., Waste Pro of Florida, Inc..(Tingley, Amy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Abner Calloway of Non-Opposition of Transfer of Case to Judge Honeywell (Shavitz, Gregg)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Waste Pro USA, Inc., Waste Pro of Florida, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Waste Pro USA, Inc. for Waste Pro USA, Inc., Waste Pro of Florida, Inc... (Tingley, Amy)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related Case Order by Waste Pro USA, Inc., Waste Pro of Florida, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Tingley, Amy) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ARJ).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiffs are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be transferred to Judge Honeywell in the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. Show Cause Response is due on or before August 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/20/2020. (MEH) ctp
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER TO DEFENDANT Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/28/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/14/2020. (MEH) ctp
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy S. Tingley on behalf of Waste Pro USA, Inc., Waste Pro of Florida, Inc. (Tingley, Amy) Modified on 7/14/2020 (DMA).
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 07/03/2020 by Abner Calloway as to Waste Pro USA, Inc.. (Shavitz, Gregg)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 07/03/2020 by Abner Calloway as to Waste Pro of Florida, Inc.. (Shavitz, Gregg)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Abner Calloway. Related case(s): Yes (Shavitz, Gregg)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Abner Calloway. (Shavitz, Gregg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Waste Pro USA, Inc., Waste Pro of Florida, Inc.. (DMA)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED Summons in a Civil Action by Abner Calloway. Amendment to #1 Complaint Summons in Civil Action. (Shavitz, Gregg) Modified on 6/25/2020 (DMA).
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED Summons in a Civil Action by Abner Calloway. Amendment to #1 Complaint (Shavitz, Gregg) Modified on 6/25/2020 (DMA).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/23/2020. (MEH) ctp
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/7/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/23/2020. (MEH) ctp
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed on or before July 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/23/2020. (MEH) ctp
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-1097-Orl-41DCI. (SJB)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16963158) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Waste Pro of Florida, #3 Proposed Summons Waste Pro USA)(Shavitz, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calloway et al v. Waste Pro USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESNY LOUIME
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN L CHANDLER
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO SANDERS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN MCKINNEY
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE DAVIS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRESHAND HARRIS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN RICHARDSON
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCOS RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABNER CALLOWAY
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT MORELAND
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLON JACKSON
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY WOLFORK
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMIEN IRVEN
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLIJIU ONONIWU
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL DAVIS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVIN WILLIAMS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREAUS SOL
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS IRIZARRY
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KACEY YATES
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANSELOR GORDON
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER GONZALEZ
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE SMITH
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENOCH MITCHELL
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILKIE JEWETT JR.,
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD REED
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYVUS BRYANT
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTROINE LANE
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW BLACK
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL SEPULVEDA
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY BAILEY
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARNELL MCCURDY
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER KIRKLAND
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARDENS PIERRE LOUISSAINT
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGIL WARREN
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINCON CAMPBELL
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAENARD TOSEN III
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTARI LEONARD
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH WILLIAMS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD FIELDS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDRICK BRINSON
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELARRIAN STALLWORTH
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS SMOTHERS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY MITCHELL
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON VALENTINE
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK WEATHER JR.,
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID RICE
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY BROWN
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO HALE
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEWIS CARTER
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE WILSON
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCE FRALEY
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCOS COATES
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CRAYTON
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDAL HAYES
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW LOUISSANT
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YASMANY MONTALVO
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LYONS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL MOORE III
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNATHAN MILLS
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE MAY
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS ANTONIO MARTINEZ
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leaenard Tosen, III
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilkie Jewett, Jr.
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Weather, Jr.
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Irizarry Nazario
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Moore, III
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Chandler
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Mills
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Erick Quezada
Represented By: Jason Rathod
Represented By: Richard E. Hayber
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Michael J. Palitz
Represented By: Logan Andrew Pardell
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE PRO OF FLORIDA, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Justin Pearce
Represented By: Jennifer Elouise Belbeck
Represented By: Amy S. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE PRO USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Pro USA, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Justin Pearce
Represented By: Jennifer Elouise Belbeck
Represented By: Amy S. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?