Primebridge Capital, LLC et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva, Bianca de Assis Fernandes, Amanda de Assis Fernandes, Primebridge Capital, LLC and Carla de Assis Fernandes
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf, Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli, Director Kathy A. Baran, The United States of America, US Attorney General William P. Barr, Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States of America and Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 6:2020cv01126
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Reset deadlines: for All Defendants. Answers to Complaint due by September 28, 2020. (KNC)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may have until and through September 28, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/20/2020. (Kidd, Embry)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Ragler, Phillip) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service of Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 6/29/2020 by Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva, Primebridge Capital, LLC, Amanda de Assis Fernandes, Bianca de Assis Fernandes, Carla de Assis Fernandes (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 7/21/2020 (KNC).
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service of Local US Attorney on 6/29/2020 by Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva, Primebridge Capital, LLC, Amanda de Assis Fernandes, Bianca de Assis Fernandes, Carla de Assis Fernandes (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 7/21/2020 (KNC).
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF of service of Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services on 6/29/2020 by Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva, Primebridge Capital, LLC, Amanda de Assis Fernandes, Bianca de Assis Fernandes, Carla de Assis Fernandes (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 7/21/2020 (KNC).
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF of service of U.S. Attorney General on 6/30/2020 by Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva, Primebridge Capital, LLC, Amanda de Assis Fernandes, Bianca de Assis Fernandes, Carla de Assis Fernandes (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 7/21/2020 (KNC).
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF of service of Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services on 6/29/2020 by Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva, Primebridge Capital, LLC, Amanda de Assis Fernandes, Bianca de Assis Fernandes, Carla de Assis Fernandes (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 7/21/2020 (KNC).
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re: #4 Related Case Order and Notice by Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva, Primebridge Capital, LLC, Amanda de Assis Fernandes, Bianca de Assis Fernandes, Carla de Assis Fernandes. Related case(s): No (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 7/9/2020 (KNC).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/8/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/22/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/8/2020. (RMF)ctp
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (KNC)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1126-Orl-78EJK. (SJB)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathy A. Baran, William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, The United States of America, Chad F. Wolf (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16980199) filed by Carla de Assis Fernandes, Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva, Primebridge Capital, LLC, Amanda de Assis Fernandes, Bianca de Assis Fernandes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Poudat, Maud)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primebridge Capital, LLC et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kathy A. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Phillip Ryan Seltzer Ragler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabricio Fernandes Ferreira da Silva
Represented By: Maud Poudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca de Assis Fernandes
Represented By: Maud Poudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda de Assis Fernandes
Represented By: Maud Poudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primebridge Capital, LLC
Represented By: Maud Poudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla de Assis Fernandes
Represented By: Maud Poudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?