Morris v. Weatherford
Appellee: Laurie K. Weatherford
Appellant: Elaine Rose Morris
Case Number: 6:2020cv01241
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 8/24/2020. (MAA)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal filed by Elaine Rose Morris. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Elaine Rose Morris. (Attachments: #1 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Transcript)(FC)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Elaine Rose Morris. Related case(s): yes (LAK)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Elaine Rose Morris. (LAK)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/20/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/20/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/20/2020. (RMF)ctp
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Elaine Rose Morris. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:19-bk-539-LVV. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of BK Appeal, #2 Order being appealed)(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Laurie K. Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elaine Rose Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?