Thomas v. U.S. Corrections, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debra thomas
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services INC, U.S Corrections LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC and Prisoner Transportation Services, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv01251
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice subject to the right of any party, within sixty days from the date of this Order, to move the Court to enter a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or, on good cause shown, to reopen the case for further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/19/2020. (MEH) ctp
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 Joint NOTICE of settlement by Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC (Clark, Alexander) Modified on 8/18/2020 (ARJ).
August 5, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Alexander D.Clark and Abtin Mehdizadegan, appearing on behalf of Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC (Filing fee $300.00 receipt number ORL092403.) Related document: #13 MOTION to appear pro hac vice . (JVS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE to counsel Abtin Mehdizadegan and Alexander D. Clark of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Debra Thomas. (Tarquin, James)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Debra Thomas. Related case(s): n (Tarquin, James)
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested Persons Order by Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.. (Joiner, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ARJ).
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested Persons Order by U.S. Corrections, LLC. (Joiner, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ARJ).
July 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by U.S. Corrections, LLC (Joiner, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ARJ).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may have until and through August 19, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/24/2020. (Kidd, Embry)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Motion for Abtin Mehdizadegan and Alexander Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/24/2020. (RMN)
July 24, 2020 Set/reset deadlines: for Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc., U.S. Corrections, LLC. Answer due by 8/19/2020. (ARJ)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 Written designation and consent to act by Elizabeth Hoskins Joiner on behalf of Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.. Local Counsel: Elizabeth Joiner. Non-Resident Counsel: Alexander Clark. (Joiner, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State of Arkansas Certificate of Good Standing Abtin Mehdizadegan, #2 Exhibit State of Arkansas Certificate of Good Standing Alexander Clark)(Joiner, Elizabeth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.. (Joiner, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel Alexander D.Clark and Abtin Mehdizadegan of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPM)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/16/2020. (RMN)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/15/2020. (MEH) ctp
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/29/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/15/2020. (MEH) ctp
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/29/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/15/2020. (MEH) ctp
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal by U.S. Corrections, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(Joiner, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/14/2020 (SPM).
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Elizabeth Joiner of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1251-Orl-41EJK. (SJB)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION / NOTICE of Special Appearance of Non-Resident Counsel by U.S Corrections LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. (Joiner, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/14/2020 (SPM).
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ninth Circuit, case number 2020CA2680 filed in State Court on 03/06/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17050692 filed by U.S Corrections LLC., Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joiner, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/14/2020 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. U.S. Corrections, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S Corrections LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoskins Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoskins Joiner
Represented By: Abtin Mehdizadegan
Represented By: Alexander D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Corrections, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoskins Joiner
Represented By: Abtin Mehdizadegan
Represented By: Alexander D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prisoner Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoskins Joiner
Represented By: Abtin Mehdizadegan
Represented By: Alexander D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra thomas
Represented By: James Patrick Tarquin
Represented By: Mark D. Dillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?