Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Elalami et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Youssef A. Elalami, Countrywide Star, Inc. d/b/a Andalusia Hookah Lounge, Youssef A. Elalami individually, and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of Countrywide Star, Inc. d/b/a Andalusia Hookah Lounge and Countrywide Star, Inc. doing business as Andalusia Hookah Lounge
Case Number: 6:2020cv01265
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Youssef A. Elalami. (ARJ)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER TO DEFENDANT Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement as to Defendant Youssef A. Elelami is due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/14/2020. (MEH) ctp
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Youssef A. Elalami.(RDO)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 7/24/2020 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Countrywide Star, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ARJ).
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 7/24/2020 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Youssef A. Elalami (Giles, Brian) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ARJ).
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Giles, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Giles, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/17/2020. (HMK)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/16/2020. (MEH) ctp
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/16/2020. (MEH) ctp
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/16/2020. (MEH) ctp (MEH).
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (SPM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Countrywide Star, Inc., Youssef A. Elalami. (SPM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1265-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Countrywide Star, Inc. d/b/a Andalusia Hookah Lounge, Youssef A. Elalami (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17061905) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giles, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Elalami et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youssef A. Elalami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Star, Inc. d/b/a Andalusia Hookah Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youssef A. Elalami individually, and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of Countrywide Star, Inc. d/b/a Andalusia Hookah Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Star, Inc. doing business as Andalusia Hookah Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?