Myles v. Orange County Corrections Department
Defendant: Orange County Corrections Department
Petitioner: David Myles and David Joshua Myles
Respondent: Warden, Orange County Jail
Case Number: 6:2020cv01271
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/10/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE. Petitioner has failed to comply with the Court's Order #3. Petitioner shall file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of the case or the imposition of appropriate sanctions without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by David Joshua Myles. (MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION by a state prisoner for writ of habeas corpus filed by David Myles.(MEJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2020: #1 Mailing Envelope) (MEJ).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/23/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Within 30 days the petitioner shall refile his petition on the standard Section 2241 form; and pay the habeas filing fee or file a completed Affidavit of Indigency or other application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/21/2020. (LAK)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by David Myles. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KNC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myles v. Orange County Corrections Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Corrections Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Joshua Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Orange County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?