Wanzek Construction, Inc. v. Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: WANZEK CONSTRUCTION
Counter Claimant: Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01273
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply (Doc. #54). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/4/2022. (EP)
December 30, 2021 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #54 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File a Sur-Reply filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Lowndes, Jennifer)
December 28, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File a Sur-Reply by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. (Mercado Robles, Yameel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #45 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/23/2021. (CB)
December 20, 2021 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lowndes, Jennifer)
December 17, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Final Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 3/17/2022 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (YG)
December 6, 2021 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Thielhelm, Robert)
November 19, 2021 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Amanda Jo Amadon filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lowndes, Jennifer)
November 12, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amanda Jo Amadon's Expert Rebuttal Report filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lowndes, Jennifer)
November 5, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Witness, Amanda Jo Amadon by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
November 5, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Lowndes, Jennifer)
October 29, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amanda Jo Amadon's Expert Rebuttal Report by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Thielhelm, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ENDORSED ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties may take the deposition of Amanda Amadon on October 12, 2021, and Angela Sist on October 13, 2021. No other deadlines are extended by this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/1/2021. (Kidd, Embry)
September 30, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion to Allow Expert Depositions After Close of Discovery by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Lowndes, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #35 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation and #36 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the Prime Contract, in light of the #39, #41 Notices of Withdrawal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/6/2021. (RMN)
July 6, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Wanzek Construction, Inc. re #36 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Prime Contract and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc. (Lowndes, Jennifer)
July 6, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Additional Appearance by Jennifer Susanne Lowndes on behalf of Wanzek Construction, Inc. (Lowndes, Jennifer)
July 2, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Wanzek Construction, Inc. re #35 MOTION to Vacate an "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc. (Lowndes, Jennifer)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #35 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate an "Attorney's Eyes Only" Designation. Response due by 7/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/29/2021. (RMN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/2/21 to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION to Vacate an "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. (Mercado Robles, Yameel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified text on 6/29/2021 (LDJ).
June 28, 2021 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Prime Contract and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Wanzek Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowndes, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified text on 6/28/2021 (LDJ).
June 25, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Vacate an "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation by Wanzek Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowndes, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified text on 6/28/2021 (LDJ).
June 18, 2021 Filing 34 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 6/17/21. Hearing outcome: No agreement.. (Alexander, Bruce)
May 17, 2021 Reset scheduling order deadlines: Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/3/2021 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/6/2021 (LDJ)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties may have until and through August 6, 2021, to serve their initial expert disclosures. The parties may have until and through September 3, 2021, to serve their rebuttal expert disclosures. All other deadlines remain as previously ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/17/2021. (Kidd, Embry)
May 13, 2021 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Witness Disclosures, Reports Deadlines and Supporting Memorandum Of Law by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Lowndes, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
May 7, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 17, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. before Bruce G. Alexander. (Thielhelm, Robert)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Joshua Robert Jacobson as Counsel of Record for Defendant Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. Attorney Joshua Robert Jacobson is terminated. The Clerk is directed to remove Mr. Jacobson from the CM/ECF service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/6/2021. (JLS)
December 28, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua Jacobson to Withdraw as Attorney by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. (Jacobson, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
October 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Bruce G. Alexander as mediator by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. (Thielhelm, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Filing 27 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LDJ)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator no later than October 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/6/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2020, Discovery due by 10/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 11/5/2021, Pretrial statement due by 3/10/2022, All other motions due by 2/24/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/9/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/13/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Bench Trial set for 4/4/2022 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Conduct mediation hearing by 7/16/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/6/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
September 17, 2020 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Subin, Ben)
September 16, 2020 Filing 23 Remark: Doc. #22 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/16/20. (EBU)
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Wanzek Construction, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mastec North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Mastec Inc. for Wanzek Construction, Inc., Wanzek Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Subin, Ben) Modified link on 9/15/2020 (LDJ).
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 Answer and Affirmative Defenses REPLY to #17 Counterclaim by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. Related document: #17 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim filed by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc..(Subin, Ben)
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 Remark: Doc. #19 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/25/20. (MT)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. (Thielhelm, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Thielhelm, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Wanzek Construction, Inc. by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc..(Thielhelm, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 Remark: Doc. #11 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/17/20. (MT)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant may have until and through August 24, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/14/2020. (Kidd, Embry)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/24/20 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. (Jacobson, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified text on 8/14/2020 (LDJ).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/11/2020. (RMN)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Thomas J. Vollbrecht to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17157999 for $150 by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment A)(Subin, Ben) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Wanzek Construction, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mastec North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Mastec, Inc. for Wanzek Construction, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment A)(Subin, Ben)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel Jennifer S. Lowndes of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies emailed)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Subin, Ben)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 07/27/2020 by Wanzek Construction, Inc. as to Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. (Subin, Ben)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. (LDJ)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Subin, Ben)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/21/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/21/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1273-Orl-37EJK. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17072589) filed by Wanzek Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Subin, Ben) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wanzek Construction, Inc. v. Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Robert Jacobson
Represented By: Yameel L. Mercado Robles
Represented By: Robert W. Thielhelm, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANZEK CONSTRUCTION
Represented By: Ben William Subin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Ben William Subin
Represented By: Thomas J. Vollbrecht
Represented By: Jennifer Susanne Lowndes
Represented By: James Keith Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?