Orlando Arthritis Institute, P.A. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Orlando Arthritis Institute, P.A.
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01474
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Kimberly Sands appointed as mediator. (RDO)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/27/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 10/27/2020, Discovery due by 7/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 8/2/2021, Pretrial statement due by 11/16/2021, All other motions due by 11/23/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 5/3/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 6/1/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for 1/3/2022 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 7/16/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/15/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to strike re: #13 Plaintiff, Orlando Arthritis Institute, P.A.'s Rule 26 Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/11/2020. (MB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 (STRICKEN BY #14 ORDER) RULE 26 Initial Disclosures by Orlando Arthritis Institute, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Nayee, Rajeev) Modified on 9/11/2020 (RDO). Modified on 9/14/2020 (RDO).
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Orlando Arthritis Institute, P.A.. (Nayee, Rajeev)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 (WRONG EVENT CODE. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED AND WILL REFILE) NOTICE by Orlando Arthritis Institute, P.A. (Nayee, Rajeev) Modified on 9/4/2020 (RDO).
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Casualty Insurance Co. for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Packer, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Packer, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Packer, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related Case Order by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Packer, Michael) Modified on 9/1/2020 (RDO).
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Packer, Michael) Modified on 9/1/2020 (RDO).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/20/2020. (MB)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/19/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/19/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1474-Orl-40GJK. (SJB)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Orange County, case number 2020-CA-006954-O filed in State Court on 07/07/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17181562 filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Court Docket Sheet , #6 State Court Other Documents State - Civil Cover Sheet, #7 State Court COMPLAINT, #8 State Court Other Documents State - Ntc of Email Designation, #9 State Court Other Documents State - NOS Roggs to Deft, #10 State Court Other Documents State - NOS RFA to Deft, #11 State Court Other Documents State - RFA to Deft, #12 State Court Other Documents State - Pltf's NOS RFP to Deft, #13 State Court Other Documents State - RFP to Deft, #14 State Court Other Documents State - Issued Summons, #15 State Court Other Documents State - NOS Process, #16 State Court Other Documents State - Deft's NOA, #17 State Court Other Documents State - MET Resp Complt)(Packer, Michael) Modified on 8/17/2020 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Arthritis Institute, P.A. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Arthritis Institute, P.A.
Represented By: Rajeev Tulsidas Nayee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Packer
Represented By: Danielle N. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?