Holdt v. Aaron's Inc
Plaintiff: Crystal Holdt
Defendant: Aaron's Inc and Aaron's Inc a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as Aaron's Sales & Lease Ownership, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01494
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #12 Plaintiff's Notice of voluntary dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/8/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Crystal Holdt (Mount, Bruce)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings by Aaron's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Vicki Winston, #2 Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Arbitration Signature Page)(Gibbs, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 8/24/2020 as to Aaron's Inc. by Crystal Holdt (Mount, Bruce) Modified on 9/2/2020 (KNC).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/20/2020. (MB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Crystal Holdt. Related case(s): no (Mount, Bruce)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Crystal Holdt. (Mount, Bruce)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Aaron's Inc. (KNC)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/19/2020. (RMF)ctp
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/19/2020. (RMF)ctp
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/19/2020. (RMF)ctp
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1494-Orl-78GJK. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron's Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17196169) filed by Crystal Holdt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mount, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holdt v. Aaron's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Holdt
Represented By: Bruce Antoine Mount, Jr.
Represented By: Carlos V. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron's Inc a Foreign Profit Corporation doing business as Aaron's Sales & Lease Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: John Sikes Gibbs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?