Tunnel IP LLC v. Namsung America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tunnel IP LLC
Defendant: Namsung America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01555
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Daniel C Irick
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Tunnel IP LLC (Wernow, Howard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tunnel IP LLC. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1-Related Cases)(Wernow, Howard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Tunnel IP LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/31/2020. (LAM)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/31/2020. (LAM)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MEJ)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Namsung America, Inc. (MEJ)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-1555-Orl-31DCI. (SJB)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Tunnel IP LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Namsung America, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17232660) filed by Tunnel IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US7916877, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tunnel IP LLC v. Namsung America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tunnel IP LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namsung America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?