Pickover v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dean Pickover
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv01608
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Crowley, Melissa)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #11 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/30/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #11 Order to show cause filed by Dean Pickover. (Gordon, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Dean Pickover. (Gordon, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dean Pickover. Related case(s): YES (Gordon, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Scott Gordon on behalf of Dean Pickover (Gordon, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Auto-Owners Insurance Company of Good Faith Effort to Comply with Local Rule 3.05 (Crowley, Melissa)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Dean Pickover. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Orders #4 and #5. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file his response to said Orders within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions pursuant to Local Rule 3.10(a). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/22/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Crowley, Melissa)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Crowley, Melissa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #6 Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Crowley, Melissa)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020.(MDH)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Dean Pickover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Originally filed in Brevard County Circuit Court on 7/27/20)(RDO)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/2/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/2/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Crowley, Melissa) Modified on 9/2/2020 (RDO).
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-1608-Orl-40LRH. (SJB)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard Clerk of Courts, case number 2020-CA-036190 filed in State Court on July 27, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17257246 filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crowley, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickover v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Danielle Crowley
Represented By: Harley Christine Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Pickover
Represented By: Gregory Alan Crutchfield
Represented By: David Scott Gordon
Represented By: Stephen R. Koons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?