Figueroa v. Florida Department of Economic Opportunity et al
Plaintiff: Alex Gerena Figueroa
Defendant: David Hillegas, E. Ivette Corrado, Thomas D. Epsky, Frank E. Brown, Florida Department of Economic Opportunity and Dr. Joseph D. Finnegan
Case Number: 6:2020cv01626
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/28/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 1, 2020 Set deadline: Amended Complaint due by 10/20/2020 (TNP)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation #3 is ADOPTED and CONFIRMED and incorporated into this Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 is DENIED without prejudice. The Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. On or before October 20, 2020, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies delineated in the Report and Recommendation and move to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee. Failure to do so will lead to dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/30/2020. (RMF)ctp
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020.(MDH)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/18/2020. (RMF)ctp
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/2/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 9/18/2020. (RMF)ctp
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/2/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/18/2020. (RMF)ctp
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/14/2020. (MDH)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Alex Gerena Figueroa. (KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Alex Gerena Figueroa.(KNC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa v. Florida Department of Economic Opportunity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hillegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Ivette Corrado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Epsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Economic Opportunity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joseph D. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Gerena Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?