Figueroa v. Walt Disney World, et al
Plaintiff: Alex Gerena Figueroa
Defendant: Walt Disney World, Joe Desiato, Don Fergurson, Ed Yunker, Rick Kotulak, Greg Becker, Asa Riggs, David Hunter, Dave Harris, Steve Muller, Trevor Ocook, Sandy Williams and Ty Joseph
Case Number: 6:2020cv01627
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attempted Service by Alex Gerena Figueroa (MEJ)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Alex Gerena Figueroa. (MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Alex Gerena Figueroa. (MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Regarding Employment and Termination by Alex Gerena Figueroa (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MEJ)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Orders #3 and #4. Plaintiff shall file a response to said Orders within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of the case without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/15/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of the Summons and Complaint. The Motion fails to comply with Local Rules 1.05 and 3.01 and Fed.R.Civ.P. 10. Further, no summons has been issued, and ample time remains to serve the complaint and summons, if issued. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/23/2020. (Irick, Daniel)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time for service of summons and complaint by Alex Gerena Figueroa. (LAK)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
September 11, 2020 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 10/9/2020, Fee payment or Renewed Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 10/9/2020 (MEJ)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice; On or before October 9, 2020, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint and to renew the motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee within the time provided may result in the case being dismissed without further warning. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff by regular mail. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/10/2020. (RN)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/9/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/9/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/9/2020. (GNB) copies mailed
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Alex Gerena Figueroa. (MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Alex Gerena Figueroa. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa v. Walt Disney World, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Desiato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Fergurson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Yunker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Kotulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Ocook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Gerena Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?