Miret v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Delia Miret
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and United States of America
Case Number: 6:2020cv01644
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Delia Miret . (Bright, Amanda) Modified on 9/24/2020 (SPM).
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related case order by Delia Miret. Related case(s): no (Bright, Amanda) Modified on 9/24/2020 (SPM).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/10/2020. (MB)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/9/2020. (MEH) ctp
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/9/2020. (MEH) ctp
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/9/2020. (MEH) ctp
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (SPM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1644-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17280119) filed by Delia Miret. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bright, Amanda) Modified on 9/8/2020 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miret v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Miret
Represented By: Amanda Anderson Bright
Represented By: Gordon Fenderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?