Scherer v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Scherer
Defendant: Zieger, Tigges & Little, LLP, steven tigges, JP Morgan Chase, stuart parcell, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Zieger, Tigges, and Little, LLP
Case Number: 6:2020cv01803
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing case re #8 Notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/13/2020. (BIA) (CTP)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Ronald E. Scherer (Rigby, Barry)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/6/2020. (HMK)
October 2, 2020 Set deadline: Amended Complaint due by 10/9/2020 (LDJ)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Friday, October 9, 2020, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that addresses the deficiencies identified in this Order. Failure to do so may result in closure of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LDJ)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1803-Orl-37GJK. (SJB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17378073) filed by Ronald E. Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to JP Morgan Chase, #3 Proposed Summons to Zeiger Tigges, #4 Proposed Summons to Parcell, #5 Proposed Summons to Tigges, #6 Exhibits A through C, #7 Exhibit D Part I, #8 Exhibit D Part II, #9 Exhibits E through O, #10 Exhibits P through R, #11 Exhibit S Part I, #12 Exhibit S Part II, #13 Exhibit S Part III, #14 Exhibit S Part IV, #15 Exhibits T through W, #16 Exhibits X through Z, #17 Exhibits AA through EE, #18 Exhibit Index)(Rigby, Barry) Modified text on 10/2/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scherer v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieger, Tigges & Little, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: steven tigges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: stuart parcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieger, Tigges, and Little, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Scherer
Represented By: Barry William Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?