Guan v. Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Appellee: Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Appellant: Alice Guan
Case Number: 6:2020cv01937
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Alice Guan. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Remove or Consolidate)(AB)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Taylor, Christina)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.. (Taylor, Christina)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Alice Guan. (Attachments: #1 2 notice of appeal, #2 3 Designation of items and statement of issues, #3 4 Transcript from 9-10-20 hearing pt 1, #4 4 Transcript from 9-10-20 hearing pt 2, #5 5 Transcript from 8-21-20 hearing pt 1, #6 5 Transcript from 8-21-20 hearing pt 2, #7 5 Transcript from 8-21-20 hearing pt 3, #8 5 Transcript from 8-21-20 hearing pt 4, #9 5a Transcript from 7-23-20 hearing, #10 5b BK docket sheet, #11 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_11_SubchapterV, #12 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000002_Statement_of_Corporate_Ownership_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Ellingsworth, #13 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000007_Notice_of_Deficient_Filing_summary_of_assets_schedules_A-BD-H_declaration_concerning_s, #14 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000008_Notice_of_Bankruptcy_Case_service_to_statutory_creditors_only_Section_341, #15 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000014_Chapter_11_Case_Management_Summary_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Ellingsworth, #16 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000015_Notice_of_Filing_Balance_Sheet_and_2019_Tax_Return_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_of_Deb, #17 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000016_Application_to_Employ_Justin_M_Luna_and_the_Law_Firm_of_Latham_Luna_Eden__Beaudine_LL, #18 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000017_Verified_Statement_in_Support_of_the_Application_to_Employ_Justin_M_Luna_and_the_Law_Firm, #19 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000018_Statement_of_Justin_M_Luna_and_Latham_Luna_Eden__Beaudine_LLP_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna, #20 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000021_Schedules_AB_D_EF_G_H_Statement_of_Assets_and_Liabilities_Statement_of_Financial_Affai, #21 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000024_Status_Report, #22 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000039_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Justin_Luna, #23 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000042_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_April_1_2020_to_April_30_2020_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_o, #24 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000043_Amended_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_03032020_to_03312020_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna, #25 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000048_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_April_1_2020_to_April_30_2020_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_o, #26 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000051_Objection_to_Debtors_Subchapter_V_Election_Filed_by_Bradley_M_Saxton_on_behalf_of_Credito, #27 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000054_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization__Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Ellingswort, #28 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000055_Part_1_Omnibus_Objection_to_Claim, #29 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000055_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #30 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000055_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #31 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000055_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #32 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000057_Notice_to_the_Court_on_Remain_in_Federal_Court_for_the_benefit_of_creditors_to_achieve_app, #33 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000058_Declaration_re_in_Support_of_Notice_to_the_Court_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #34 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000059_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Subchapter_V_Election_Filed_by_Brad, #35 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000060_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Subchapter_V_Election_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_G, #36 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000061_Response_to, #37 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000062_Emergency_Motion_to_Participate_in_Person_Via_Live_Call_Through_the_Court_Call_System_at_t, #38 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000063_Emergency_Motion_to_Participate_in_Person_Via_Live_Call_Through_the_Court_Call_System_at_t, #39 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000064_Combined_Amended_Motion, #40 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000065_Notice_of_Filing_Transcript_of_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_Filed_by_Bradley_M_Saxton, #41 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000066_Notice_of_Filing_341_Creditors_Meeting_Transcript_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #42 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000067_Motion_for_Authority_to_Maintain_Pre-Petition_Bank_Accounts_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_beha, #43 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000070_Amended_Schedule_G_Amendment_to_Statement_of_Financial_Affairs, #44 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000071_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Audrey_Aleskovsky, #45 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000073_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_512020_to_5312020_Filed_by_Justin_M_Luna_on_behalf_o, #46 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000079_Order_Scheduling_Hearing_on_Confirmation_of_Plan_and_Establishing_Deadlines, #47 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000085_Second_Amended_Motion_and_Amended_Response_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #48 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000087_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_Q_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #49 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000088_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_R_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #50 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000089_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_W_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #51 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000090_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_V_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #52 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000091_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_U_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #53 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000092_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_T_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #54 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000093_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_S_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #55 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000094_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibit_EE_for_Amended_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #56 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000095_Exhibit_W_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #57 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000096_Exhibit_V_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #58 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000097_Exhibit_U_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #59 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000098_Exhibit_T_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #60 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000099_Exhibit_S_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #61 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000100_Exhibit_R_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #62 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000101_Exhibit_GGG_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #63 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000102_Exhibit_FFF_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #64 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000103_Exhibit_EEE_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #65 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000104_Exhibit_DDD_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #66 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000105_Exhibit_CCC_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #67 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000106_Exhibit_AAA_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #68 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000107_Exhibit_BBB_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #69 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000108_Objection_to_Debtors_Omnibus_Objection_to_Claims_4_and_5_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #70 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000110_Notice_of_Filing_Response_in_Opposition_to_Debtors_Ominibus_Obj_to_Allowance_of_Claim_4-, #71 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000111_Exhibit_EE_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #72 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000112_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_for_Amended_claims_4-3, #73 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000113_Exhibit_Q_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #74 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000114_Exhibit_R_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #75 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000115_Exhibit_S_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #76 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000116_Exhibit_T_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #77 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000117_Exhibit_U_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #78 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000118_Exhibit_V_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #79 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000119_Exhibit_HHH_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #80 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000120_Supplemental_Exhibit_FFF_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #81 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000121_Notice_of_Filing_of_June_17_Hearing_Transcript_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #82 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000122_Supplemental_Response_to_Opposition_to_Omnibus_Objection_to_Allowance_of_Claim_4_and_5_Fil, #83 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000125_Notice_of_Filing_Appeal_Cover_sheet_and_Appeal_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #84 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000126_Corrective_Notice_of_Filing_Appeal_Cover_sheet_and_Appeal_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #85 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000127_Notice_of_Appeal_Re_Order_Scheduling_Hearing_on_Confirmation_of_Plan_and_Establishing_De, #86 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000128_Order_Abating_Notice_of_Appeal_-_no_fee, #87 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000129_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Chapter_11_Plan_of_Reorganization_and_a_Ballot_Filed_by_Justin, #88 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000130_Exhibit_W_Filed_by_Creditor_Alice_Guan, #89 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000132_Order_Directing_Immediate_Payment_of_Filing_Fee_298, #90 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000133_Notice_of_Filing_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certification_of_Direct_App, #91 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000134_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certification_of_Direct_Appeal_to_Eleventh_C, #92 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000135_Notice_of_Filing_Motion_for_Accepting_at_Least_One_of_the_Three_Checks_Each_Paying_for_the, #93 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000136_Motion_for_Accepting_at_Least_One_of_Three_Checks_each_Paying_for_the_Filing_Fee_of_2980, #94 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000137_Certificate_of_Mailing_via_Bankruptcy_Noticing_Center_re_Notice_of_Appeal, #95 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000142_Order_Overruling_Alice_Guans_Objection_to_Debtors_Eligibility_under_Subchapter_V, #96 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000144_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certificati, #97 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000145_Transmittal_of_Notice_of_Appeal_to_District_Court_Case_No_620-cv-1243-Orl-WWB, #98 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000146_Notice_of_Filing_Objection_to_Debtors_Plan_and_Motion_for_Case_Not_Dismissed_and_for_Relie, #99 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000147_Objection_to_Debtors_Plan_and_Motion_for_Case_Not_Dismissed_and_for_Relief_form_Automatic, #100 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000149_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_and_Written_Rejection_of_Debtors_Plan_Filed_by_Creditor, #101 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000150_Notice_of_Filing_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_and_Written_Rejection_of_Debtors_Plan, #102 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000151_Emergency_Amended_Motion_Supplemental_to_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Automatic_Stay_as_to, #103 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000152_Notice_of_Filing_Emergency_Amended_Motion_Supplemental_to_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Auto, #104 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000153_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Authority_to_Maintain_Pre-Petition_Bank_Accoun, #105 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000154_Supplement_to_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal_and_Motion_for_Certification_of_Direct_Appeal, #106 6-20-bk-01346_Docket_000155_Notice_of_Filing_Supplement_to_Motion_for_Stay_Pending_Appeal
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/13/2020. (RMF)ctp
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/27/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/13/2020. (RMF)ctp
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/27/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/13/2020. (RMF)ctp
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Alice Guan. (LAK)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alice Guan. Related case(s): yes (LAK)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Wendy W. Berger. New case number: 6:20-cv-1937-ORL-78. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b), the Court hereby orders this case to be transferred to U.S. District Judge Wendy W. Berger, with her consent, for consideration with Case No. 6:20-cv-1243-Orl-78. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (BIA) (ctp)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of interlocutory appeal by Alice Guan. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:20-bk-1346-KSJ. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Transcript of 7/23/2020 Hearing)(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guan v. Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Luna
Represented By: Christina Y. Taylor
Represented By: Daniel A. Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alice Guan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?