Philpot v. Watermark Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Watermark Media, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv01987
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Larry G. Philpot. (Parwani, Rinky)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Larry G. Philpot. Related case(s): No (Parwani, Rinky)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing compliance. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to Orders #5 and #6 on or before November 25, 2020. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the case or the imposition of sanctions without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/19/2020. (RMF)ctp
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to Watermark Media, Inc. on 11/4/2020 by Larry G. Philpot. (LDJ)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 (INCORRECT EVENT USED. REFILED AT DOC #10) NOTICE by Larry G. Philpot Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons (Parwani, Rinky) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (LDJ).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/2/2020. (HMK)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/30/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/13/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 10/30/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/13/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/30/2020. (RMF)ctp
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (LDJ)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Watermark Media, Inc. (LDJ)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-1987-Orl-78GJK. (SJB)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Watermark Media, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17474060) filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplement Certificate of Interested Persons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Supplement Copyright Report)(Parwani, Rinky) Modified text on 10/27/2020 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Watermark Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Rinky S. Parwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watermark Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?