Rabello v. Chief of Immigrant Investor Program et al
Plaintiff: Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello
Defendant: Secretary Chad F. Wolf, Attorney General William Barr, Division Chief Lori Mackenzie, Chief Sarah Kendall, Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief of Immigrant Investor Program, Chief of Immigrant Investor Program, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 6:2020cv01994
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anne C Conway
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/6/2021. (Conway, Anne)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello (Hurd, Rusten)
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello as to USAtty on 11/2/2020. (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 11/9/2020 (MAA).
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello. Attorney General of the United States served on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello. Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello. Division Chief of Immigrant Investor Program served on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello. Chief of Immigrant Investor Program served on 11/4/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case/interested persons/ECF-1 by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello. (Hurd, Rusten)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related Case Order by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello. Related case(s): no (Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 10/30/2020 (RDO).
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RDO)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 1, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/12/2020. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 10/28/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-1994-Orl-22DCI. (SJB)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Mandamus Relief against all Defendant. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17476735) filed by Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summon (Kendall), #3 Proposed Summons Summon (Mackenzie), #4 Proposed Summons Summon (Cuccinnelli), #5 Proposed Summons Summon (Wolf), #6 Proposed Summons Summon (Barr), #7 Proposed Summons Summon (Chapa Lopez))(Hurd, Rusten) Modified on 10/28/2020 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabello v. Chief of Immigrant Investor Program et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Lori Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Sarah Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief of Immigrant Investor Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Immigrant Investor Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelo Albuquerque Rabello
Represented By: Rusten C. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?