Palermo et al v. Brevard County
Petitioner: Joseph Palermo and Tammy Palermo
Respondent: Brevard County
Case Number: 6:2020cv02217
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Set/reset deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss re #13 Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim. Reply in Support due by 2/4/2021. (MEJ)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion for Leave to File Reply. On or before 2/4/2021, Respondent may file the requested five-page reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/27/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
January 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in support of #15 Motion to Dismiss by Brevard County. (Scott, Dale) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 1/27/2021 (MEJ).
January 25, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss re #13 Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph Palermo. (Wilson, J.)
January 21, 2021 Filing 19 CASE REFERRED to Mediation (mediator TBD). (MEJ)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the parties to confer and advise the Court on the selection of a mediator within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/20/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2021, Discovery due by 1/3/2022, Dispositive motions due by 2/1/2022, Pretrial statement due by 5/16/2022, All other motions due by 5/23/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 11/1/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 12/1/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2022 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for 7/5/2022 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 1/17/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/20/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed
January 18, 2021 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Scott, Dale)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss re #13 Amended Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Brevard County. (Scott, Dale) Modified text on 1/12/2021 (MEJ).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Amended Petition #13. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/4/2021. (JRR)
December 31, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED Petition in Inverse Condemnation and Negligence by Joseph Palermo. (Wilson, J.) Modified text on 1/4/2021 (MEJ).
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Brevard County. (Scott, Dale) Modified text on 12/21/2020 (MEJ).
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Brevard County. (Scott, Dale)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Cases Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brevard County. Related case(s): yes (Scott, Dale) Modified text on 12/18/2020 (MEJ).
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Joseph Palermo. (Wilson, J.)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Cases Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joseph Palermo. Related case(s): yes (Wilson, J.) Modified text on 12/9/2020 (MEJ).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Brevard County (Civil Cover Sheet) (Scott, Dale)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/7/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/7/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Dale Scott of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-2217-Orl-40DCI. (SJB)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Brevard County, Florida, case number Case No. 05-2020-048004-CA filed in State Court on October 27, 2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17627476 filed by Brevard County. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Petition in Inverse Condemnation, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Return of Service)(Scott, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palermo et al v. Brevard County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Palermo
Represented By: J. Christy Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tammy Palermo
Represented By: J. Christy Wilson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brevard County
Represented By: Dale Alan Scott
Represented By: Michael J. Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?