Ekbatani et al v. Community Care Health Network, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shahrzad Ekbatani, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani and Terrence Diaz
Defendant: The Providence Service Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Frazier Healthcare VII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare Ventures, Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Fund VIII, L.P., Community Care Health Network LLC d/b/a Matrix Medical Network, Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Affiliates VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII-A,L.P., Frazier Management LLC d/b/a Frazier Healthcare Partners, The Providence Service Corporation, Community Care Health Network, LLC doing business as Matrix Medical Network and Frazier Management, LLC doing business as Frazier Healthcare Partners
Case Number: 6:2020cv02224
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0025
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. All defendants shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/29/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed
January 28, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Community Care Health Network, LLC (Schifino, William)
January 22, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan W. Hill on behalf of Community Care Health Network, LLC (Hill, Nathan)
January 22, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Wells on behalf of Community Care Health Network, LLC (Wells, David)
January 22, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Alan Ross on behalf of The Providence Service Corporation (Ross, Jason)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule. Defendants may file their Motion to Dismiss on or before March 9, 2021. Plaintiffs must file a response on or before April 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/21/2021. (CPH)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/20/2021. (RN)
January 20, 2021 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and by All Defendants. (Lechich, Brian)
January 19, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher T. Holding to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17784516 for $150 by Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Affiliates VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Fund VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII-A,L.P., Frazier Healthcare Ventures, Frazier Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Lechich, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 19, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Benjamin Hayes to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17784511 for $150 by Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Affiliates VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Fund VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII-A,L.P., Frazier Healthcare Ventures, Frazier Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Lechich, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Jordan Weiss to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17784503 for $150 by Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Affiliates VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Fund VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII-A,L.P., Frazier Healthcare Ventures, Frazier Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Lechich, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian John Lechich on behalf of Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Affiliates VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Fund VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII-A,L.P., Frazier Healthcare Ventures, Frazier Management, LLC (Lechich, Brian)
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Terrence Diaz, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani, Shahrzad Ekbatani of Service of Related Case Order and Track Two Notice (Bennett, Desmonne)
January 12, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER of service returned executed on January 11, 2021 by Terrence Diaz, Shahrzad Ekbatani, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani as to Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Affiliates VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Fund VIII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII, L.P., Frazier Healthcare VII-A,L.P., Frazier Healthcare Ventures, Frazier Management, LLC. (Bennett, Desmonne)
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER of service returned executed on January 8, 2021 by Terrence Diaz, Shahrzad Ekbatani, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani as to The Providence Service Corporation. (Bennett, Desmonne)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Terrence Diaz, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani, Shahrzad Ekbatani (of Service of Related Case Order and Track Two Notice) (Bennett, Desmonne)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on December 28, 2020 by Terrence Diaz, Shahrzad Ekbatani, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani as to Community Care Health Network, LLC. (Bennett, Desmonne) Modified on 1/5/2021 (RDO).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/22/2020. (RN)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Kathryn E. Bettini to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17690517 for $150 by Terrence Diaz, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani, Shahrzad Ekbatani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sasso, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Randall H. Miller to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17690512 for $150 by Terrence Diaz, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani, Shahrzad Ekbatani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sasso, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Lawrence G. Scarborough to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17690504 for $150 by Terrence Diaz, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani, Shahrzad Ekbatani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sasso, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Desmonne A. Bennett to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17690324 for $150 by Terrence Diaz, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani, Shahrzad Ekbatani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sasso, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Terrence Diaz, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani, Shahrzad Ekbatani. (Sasso, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #3 Related Case Order by Terrence Diaz, Shahriar "James" Ekbatani, Shahrzad Ekbatani. Related case(s): Yes (Sasso, Michael) Modified on 12/22/2020 (RDO).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/7/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/7/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-2224-Orl-40DCI. (SJB)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17630980) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sasso, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ekbatani et al v. Community Care Health Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Providence Service Corporation, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier Healthcare VII, L.P.
Represented By: Jordan David Weiss
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Benjamin Timothy Christian Hayes
Represented By: Christopher T. Holding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier Healthcare Ventures
Represented By: Jordan David Weiss
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Benjamin Timothy Christian Hayes
Represented By: Christopher T. Holding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Fund VIII, L.P.
Represented By: Jordan David Weiss
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Benjamin Timothy Christian Hayes
Represented By: Christopher T. Holding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Care Health Network LLC d/b/a Matrix Medical Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier Healthcare Growth Buyout Affiliates VIII, L.P.
Represented By: Jordan David Weiss
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Benjamin Timothy Christian Hayes
Represented By: Christopher T. Holding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier Healthcare VII-A,L.P.
Represented By: Jordan David Weiss
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Benjamin Timothy Christian Hayes
Represented By: Christopher T. Holding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier Management LLC d/b/a Frazier Healthcare Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Providence Service Corporation
Represented By: Jason Alan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Care Health Network, LLC doing business as Matrix Medical Network
Represented By: Nathan W. Hill
Represented By: William J. Schifino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier Management, LLC doing business as Frazier Healthcare Partners
Represented By: Jordan David Weiss
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Represented By: Brian John Lechich
Represented By: Benjamin Timothy Christian Hayes
Represented By: Christopher T. Holding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahrzad Ekbatani
Represented By: Michael Adam Sasso
Represented By: Lawrence G. Scarborough
Represented By: Desmonne A. Bennett
Represented By: Kathryn E. Bettini
Represented By: Randall H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahriar "James" Ekbatani
Represented By: Michael Adam Sasso
Represented By: Lawrence G. Scarborough
Represented By: Desmonne A. Bennett
Represented By: Kathryn E. Bettini
Represented By: Randall H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Diaz
Represented By: Michael Adam Sasso
Represented By: Lawrence G. Scarborough
Represented By: Desmonne A. Bennett
Represented By: Kathryn E. Bettini
Represented By: Randall H. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?