United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3018 Kingfisher Point, Chuluota, FL 32766
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 3018 Kingfisher Point, Chuluota, FL 32766
Case Number: 6:2020cv02306
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerk's Default against the Defendant by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Composite A-1, #3 Composite A-2)(Andrejko, Nicole) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 2/9/2021 (RDO).
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: an official government site, (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication for at least 30 consecutive days, beginning December 24, 2020 and ending on January 22, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Andrejko, Nicole)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF of service by United States of America (Andrejko, Nicole)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States of America. (Andrejko, Nicole)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/28/2020. (GNB) copies e-mailed (GNB). Modified on 12/28/2020 (GNB).
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED Notice of Pendency of Related Cases United States of America. Related cases; yes. (Andrejko, Nicole) Modified on 12/29/2020 (RDO).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND WRIT OF ENTRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/22/2020. (JLE)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Andrejko, Nicole)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): no (RDO)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION for Writ of Entry by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against Real Property Located at 3018 Kingfisher Point, Chuluota, FL 32766 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3018 Kingfisher Point, Chuluota, FL 32766
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 3018 Kingfisher Point, Chuluota, FL 32766
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Andrejko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?