Massey Mount et al v. Pulte Home Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Quineisha Hylton, Beverly Massey Mount, Nathaniel Jackson, Teresa Johnson and Shaquatan Nicole Flemming
Defendant: S&ME, Inc. and Pulte Home Company, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv02314
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1711
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Buckley, Martin)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying as moot #25 Motion ; denying #26 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/4/2021. (BIA)
February 4, 2021 Filing 37 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: TBD (KNC)
February 4, 2021 Set deadlines: Defendant, Pulte Home Company, LLC's Reply due by 2/10/2021. (KNC)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator no later than March 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/3/2021. (BIA)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 4/9/2021, Discovery due by 11/4/2022, Dispositive motions due by 12/5/2022, Pretrial statement due by 4/13/2023, All other motions due by 3/30/2023, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/2/2022, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/3/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Jury Trial set for 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.., Conduct mediation hearing by 12/19/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/3/2021. (BIA)
February 3, 2021 Filing 34 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Rule 16) held on 2/3/2021. Court Reporter: Amie First (BIA)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #32 Motion for Leave to File Document. By Wednesday, February 10, 2021 Defendant Pulte Home Company, LLC may file a reply, not to exceed five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/3/2021. (EJV)
February 2, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Justice, Joseph)
February 1, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael J. Laramie, appearing on behalf of Pulte Home Company, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL096215.) Related document: #29 MOTION for Michael J. Laramie to appear pro hac vice . (TNP)
February 1, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Susan McNeill McKeever, appearing on behalf of Pulte Home Company, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL096216.) Related document: #30 MOTION for Susan McKeever to appear pro hac vice . (TNP)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael J. Laramie, Esq. and Susan McKeever, Esq., may specially appear in this case as counsel for Defendant Pulte Home Company, LLC with Martin T. Buckley, Esq. and Joseph S. Justice, Esq., serving as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/27/2021. (MKH)
January 26, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Susan McKeever to appear pro hac vice by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lopez, Tara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
January 26, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Michael J. Laramie to appear pro hac vice by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lopez, Tara) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
January 20, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of hearing: re: #25 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically designation of case and to set a Preliminary Case Management Conference Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Rule 16) set for 2/3/2021 at 10:00 am before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Counsel for the parties shall call 1-888-684-8852, access code 5851307, security code 020321, for the hearing. Counsel for the parties are instructed to call in AT LEAST five minutes prior to the hearing start time.(BIA) Modified on 1/20/2021 (BIA).
January 19, 2021 Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Justice, Joseph)
January 19, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Issuance of a Stay of Discovery by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Justice, Joseph) Modified on 1/20/2021 (matched text to pleading) (KNC).
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically designation of case and to set a Preliminary Case Management Conference by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Justice, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Shaquatan Nicole Flemming, Quineisha Hylton, Nathaniel Jackson, Teresa Johnson, Beverly Massey Mount. (Karrick, S.)
January 6, 2021 Filing 23 Remark: Docs. #18 and #20 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/6/21. (EBU)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER discharging #7 the Court's December 22, 2020, Order to Show Cause in light of Defendant's response (Doc. #15). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/6/2021. (JTB)
January 5, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Case Order and Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Shaquatan Nicole Flemming, Quineisha Hylton, Nathaniel Jackson, Teresa Johnson, Beverly Massey Mount. Related case(s): Yes (Karrick, S.) Modified on 1/6/2021 (linked entry to Order) (KNC).
January 5, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Shaquatan Nicole Flemming, Quineisha Hylton, Nathaniel Jackson, Teresa Johnson, Beverly Massey Mount. (Karrick, S.)
January 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Pulte Home Company, LLC. Related case(s): n (Justice, Joseph)
January 5, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Pulte Home Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pulte Diversified Company, LLC, Other Affiliate PulteGroup, Inc. for Pulte Home Company, LLC.. (Justice, Joseph)
January 5, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related Case Order and Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by S&ME, Inc. Related case(s): No (Snelson, Mark) Modified on 1/6/2021 (linked entry with Order) (KNC).
January 5, 2021 Filing 16 Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/5/21. (EBU)
January 4, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 Order to show cause filed by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Justice, Joseph)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Joinder in Pulte Home Company, LLC's Motion to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by S&ME, Inc.. (Snelson, Mark)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by S&ME, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Littlejohn Engineering Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate S&ME of Michigan, Inc. for S&ME, Inc... (Snelson, Mark)
December 30, 2020 Reset deadlines: for S&ME, Inc. Answer to Complaint due on or before 1/4/2021. (KNC)
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of consent to removal by S&ME, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal . (Snelson, Mark) Modified on 12/30/2020 (text modified to match pleading) (KNC).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendant S&ME, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended up to and including January 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/29/2020. (ECJ)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Baird on behalf of S&ME, Inc. (Baird, Edward)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by S&ME, Inc.. (Snelson, Mark) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Buckley, Martin)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By Monday, January 4, 2021, Defendants are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response why their claim for jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)should not be dismissed or disregarded due to deficient citizenship allegations. The response must be supported by evidence, which should be in the form of an affidavit or declaration under penalty of perjury. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/22/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/5/2021. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/22/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/5/2021. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/22/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Tara Lopez of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC) ctp
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-2314-Orl-37LRH. (SJB)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-011523-O filed in State Court on 11/18/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17683673 filed by Pulte Home Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 State Court Docket Sheet)(Buckley, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey Mount et al v. Pulte Home Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quineisha Hylton
Represented By: Tyler R. Kobylinski
Represented By: S. Maxwell Karrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Massey Mount
Represented By: Tyler R. Kobylinski
Represented By: S. Maxwell Karrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Jackson
Represented By: Tyler R. Kobylinski
Represented By: S. Maxwell Karrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Johnson
Represented By: Tyler R. Kobylinski
Represented By: S. Maxwell Karrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaquatan Nicole Flemming
Represented By: Tyler R. Kobylinski
Represented By: S. Maxwell Karrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&ME, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Snelson
Represented By: Edward M. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Home Company, LLC
Represented By: Martin Thomas Buckley
Represented By: Susan McNeill McKeever
Represented By: Joseph S. Justice
Represented By: Michael J. Laramie
Represented By: Tara Stephens Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?