Southern-Owners Insurance Company v. U.S. Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Coconut Creek Properties Inc. and U.S. Heating and Air Conditioning Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00085
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Stay and Memorandum of Law by U.S. Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc. (Benitez, Agustin) Modified on 3/12/2021 (SPM).
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by U.S. Heating and Air Conditioning Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Benitez, Agustin)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by U.S. Heating and Air Conditioning Inc.. (Benitez, Agustin)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Coconut Creek Properties Inc. and U.S. Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. (ARJ)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Leininger, Carri)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. Related case(s): yes (Leininger, Carri)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/20/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/3/2021. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/20/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/3/2021. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/20/2021. (MEH) ctp
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-0085-Orl-41LRH. (SJB)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number 113A-17757513) filed by Southern-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Protection Policy Declarations, #2 Exhibit B-First amended complaint from Brevard County, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leininger, Carri) Modified text on 1/13/2021 (ARJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern-Owners Insurance Company v. U.S. Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coconut Creek Properties Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Heating and Air Conditioning Inc.
Represented By: Agustin R. Benitez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Carri S. Leininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?