Payton v. DHS Customs and Border Protection
Plaintiff: Marsha Payton
Defendant: DHS Customs and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security, Acting Commissioner, DHS Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Merit System Protection Board and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Case Number: 6:2021cv00096
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE to the Court Regarding Case Management Report Conference by Marsha Payton (KNC)
March 10, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE to the Court by Marsha Payton (KNC)
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing by Marsha Payton (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KNC)
March 2, 2021 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT- Reply by Marsha Payton (KNC)
February 22, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT (construed) against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Marsha Payton. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KNC)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Correspondence and REPLY to #16 Report and Recommendations by Marsha Payton. (TNP)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Correspondence with EEOC OFO/WAO by Marsha Payton (TNP)
February 16, 2021 FEES paid by Marsha Payton (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ORL096518) (TNP)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #15 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Marsha Payton. It is RECOMMENDED that the Motion (Doc. 15) be DENIED; and the Clerk of Court be directed to CLOSE the case. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/9/2021. (RN)
February 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Marsha Payton. (KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Attempted Communication by Marsha Payton re 10 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule (KNC)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Marsha Payton re 10 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(KNC)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Marsha Payton. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(KNC)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Marsha Payton. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases listed in Rule 3.02(d). These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Marsha Payton (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KNC)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida have been amended effective February 1, 2021, and will apply, as amended and in accordance with the January 13, 2021 Standing Order, to this case for all filings made on or after February 1, 2021. Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the striking of non-compliant filings, dismissal of this action, or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/28/2021. (RMF)ctp
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing USDC Southern District of Florida Case Dismissal by Marsha Payton (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Receipt of Mailing for January 13, 2021 by Marsha Payton (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(TNP)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (RN)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/19/2021. (RMF)ctp
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/2/2021. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/19/2021. (RMF)ctp
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/2/2021. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/19/2021. (RMF)ctp
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DHS Customs and Border Protection filed by Marsha Payton. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ORL096518) (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Mailing Envelope)(KNC) Modified on 2/16/2021 (TNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payton v. DHS Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner, DHS Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Merit System Protection Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?