Turner v. Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yolanda Turner
Defendant: Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00161
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #35 MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production and to Compel Dates for Depositions , #34 Response in Opposition to Motion to Defendant's Motion to Stay by Yolanda Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hill, Brandon)
September 17, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production and to Compel Dates for Depositions filed by Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Zandy, Aaron) Modified text on 9/20/2021 (MEJ).
September 3, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production and to Compel Dates for Depositions by Yolanda Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests Served on Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Discovery Responses)(Hill, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 4, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon)
July 16, 2021 Set deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Plaintiff Response due by 8/4/2021 (ARJ)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Unopposed Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline. On or before August 4, 2021, Plaintiff may file a response to the #31 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/15/2021. (KMS)
July 14, 2021 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Two Weeks as to #31 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (TNP).
July 7, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jonni Kimberly, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants Motion to Certify for Interlocutory Review, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Defendants Motion Certify Interlocutory Review, #7 Exhibit 7 - Amended Order Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Miscellaneous Case Docket, #9 Exhibit 9 - Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Civil Appeal Statement, #11 Exhibit 11 - Stipulation and Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, #12 Exhibit 12 - Jones v Scribe Docket Report, #13 Exhibit 13 - Easom v US Well Service Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Easom v US Well Service Petition for Permission to Appeal)(Zandy, Aaron)
July 7, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane T. Munoz on behalf of Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Munoz, Shane)
May 18, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Olsen on behalf of Yolanda Turner (Olsen, Mary)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 5/14/2021. (Baker, David)
May 10, 2021 Filing 27 Amended MOTION for Stuart Miller to appear pro hac vice and Consent to Act by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c)(1) #25 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT. Counsel must affirmatively represent he is not a member of The Florida Bar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/7/2021. (HMK)
May 6, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Stuart Miller to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18224720 for $150 by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER denying #21 AMENDED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT. Counsel is a member in good standing of the Florida Bar, therefore she does not meet the requirements for admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/6/2021. (HMK)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 AMENDED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Counsel must take the tutorial offered on the Middle District of Florida's website before using the CM/ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/5/2021. (HMK)
May 4, 2021 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for Michael Vance McCrary to appear pro hac vice by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 4, 2021 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Mary Olsen to appear pro hac vice by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 3, 2021 Filing 20 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc..(Zandy, Aaron)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying #17 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT; denying #18 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND WRITTEN DESIGNATION AND CONSENT TO ACT for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/26/2021. (HMK)
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for M. Vance McCrary to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18174797 for $150 by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 23, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Mary E. Olsen to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18174780 for $150 by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 22, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Zandy, Aaron) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (TNP).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 DEFENDANT ROSEN HOTELS & RESORTS, INC.'S FINALUNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH SUPPORTING AUTHORITY. Defendant shall file a response on or before May 3, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/13/2021. (HMK)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Zandy, Aaron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: Carlos Burruezo (ARJ)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 5/22/2021, Discovery due by 6/6/2022, Dispositive motions due by 7/6/2022, Pretrial statement due by 11/8/2022, All other motions due by 11/8/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/6/2022, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/6/2022, Trial Status Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza, Jury Trial set for December 2022 in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza., Conduct mediation hearing by 6/20/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/1/2021. (MEH) ctp
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel Stuart J. Miller, Johnathan Miller, Mary E. Olsen, and M. Vance McCrary Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed) (SPM)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hill, Brandon)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Yolanda Turner. (Hill, Brandon)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 DEFENDANT ROSEN HOTELS & RESORTS, INC.'S SECONDUNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH SUPPORTING Authority. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 3/22/2021. (HMK)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/12/21 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (Zandy, Aaron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 3/22/2021 (LDJ).
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 DEFENDANT ROSEN HOTELS & RESORTS, INC.'S UNOPPOSEDMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH SUPPORTING AUTHORITY. Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint on or before March 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/22/2021. (HMK)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Zandy, Aaron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on January 29, 2021 by Yolanda Turner as to Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.. (Hill, Brandon)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc. (MEJ)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0161-Orl-41GJK. (SJB)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17801824) filed by Yolanda Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hill, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Turner
Represented By: Brandon J. Hill
Represented By: Luis A. Cabassa
Represented By: Mary E. Olsen
Represented By: Michael Vance McCrary
Represented By: Stuart J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosen Hotels and Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron L. Zandy
Represented By: Bret Carson Yaw
Represented By: Shane T. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?