Trossett et al v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nihla Trossett and George Trossett
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv00172
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Robert M. Daisley, Esq. as mediator by George Trossett, Nihla Trossett. (Krapf, Grant)
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE to counsel Benjamin Joseph Russell of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC)
March 16, 2021 Filing 21 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: TBD (KNC)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/3/2021.(MDH)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator no later than March 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/15/2021. (BIA)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2021, Discovery due by 11/2/2021, Dispositive motions due by 12/2/2021, Pretrial statement due by 4/14/2022, All other motions due by 3/31/2022, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/18/2021, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/19/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.., Conduct mediation hearing by 11/12/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/15/2021. (BIA)
February 23, 2021 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rumbley, Charles)
February 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Martin Bragg on behalf of George Trossett, Nihla Trossett (Bragg, Andrew)
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by George Trossett, Nihla Trossett. Related case(s): Yes (Krapf, Grant)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 Remark: Doc. #10 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/17/2021. (EJV)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 Remark: Doc. #7 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/16/2021. (EJV)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (RDO)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Plaintiffs. Related case(s): Yes (RDO)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order pdf by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aspen Insurance Holdings Limited, a Bermuda corporation for Aspen Specialty Insurance Company.. (Rumbley, Charles)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #12) NOTICE by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company re #6 Order pdf Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Rumbley, Charles) Modified on 2/16/2021 (RDO).
February 15, 2021 Filing 8 (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT DOC. #11) NOTICE by George Trossett, Nihla Trossett Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Krapf, Grant) Modified on 2/16/2021 (RDO).
February 15, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order pdf by George Trossett, Nihla Trossett. (Krapf, Grant)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/2/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (Rumbley, Charles)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company.(Rumbley, Charles)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aspen Insurance Holdings Limited, for Aspen Specialty Insurance Company.. (Rumbley, Charles)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-0172-Orl-37LRH. (SJB)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial Circuit, case number 05-2020-CA-054036-XXXX-XX filed in State Court on 12/10/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17807106 filed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Listing for removal)(Rumbley, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trossett et al v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nihla Trossett
Represented By: Grant W. Krapf
Represented By: Andrew Martin Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Trossett
Represented By: Grant W. Krapf
Represented By: Andrew Martin Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles R. Rumbley
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?