Meza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angelina Meza
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv00222
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Embry J Kidd
Referring Judge: G Kendall Sharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Stay of Proceedings by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Rudy, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 4/1/2021 (SPM).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROOF of service by Angelina Meza as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 2/8/2021 (Culbertson, Richard) Modified on 3/16/2021 (SPM).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROOF of service by Angelina Meza as to the Attorney General on 2/10/2021 (Culbertson, Richard) Modified on 3/16/2021 (SPM).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Angelina Meza. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Culbertson, Richard)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Angelina Meza. (Culbertson, Richard)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER: Parties have 14 days from the date of this Order to file their Disclosure Statement (if not already filed) and, additionally to notify the Court of a related action by filing a Notice of Related Action, Local Rule 1.07(c), that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District of Florida or elsewhere (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 2/10/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPM)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (SPM)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-0222-GKS-EJK. (SJB)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Patience Jacobs on behalf of Angelina Meza (Jacobs, Sarah)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17837757) filed by Angelina Meza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Culbertson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Meza
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Represented By: Sarah Patience Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?