Perez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: wendy perez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 6:2021cv00257
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to show cause filed by Wendy Perez. (LeFevre, Ashley)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to show cause to Plaintiff as to why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file her Disclosure Statement #3. Response due within 7 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/22/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ARJ)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wendy Perez. Related case(s): No (LeFevre, Ashley) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (ARJ).
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Wendy Perez. (LeFevre, Ashley)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (ARJ)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/8/2021. (counsel emailed)(AKC)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-257-JA-EJK. (LRB)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number 113A-17857230) filed by Wendy Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeFevre, Ashley) Modified text on 2/8/2021 (ARJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: wendy perez
Represented By: Ashley Cherry LeFevre
Represented By: Paul J. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?