Medrano v. Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS")
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Medrano
Defendant: Kimberly Dean and Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS")
Case Number: 6:2021cv00320
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing case re #7 Notice of voluntary dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/15/2021. (RMF)ctp
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Maria Del Carmen Medrano (Perez, Henye)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of service by Maria Del Carmen Medrano re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons issued . (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope Certified Mail Receipt)(Perez, Henye)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/25/2021. (RMF)ctp
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/25/2021. (RMF)ctp
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS"). (TNP)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-0320-WWB-DCI. (SJB)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kimberly Dean (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17894599) filed by Maria Del Carmen Medrano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Perez, Henye)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medrano v. Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Medrano
Represented By: Henye S. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, Orlando Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?