Khan v. Secretary, U.S. Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Mohammed Bilal Khan
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson, Peggy Petrovich, Francis L. Cissna, Alejandra Mayorkas, Antony Blinken, Ryan Palsrok, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney General, Secretary, U.S. Department of State, Consular Section Chief, U.S. Consulate, Casablanca, Morocco, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security and Director, National Visa Center, U.S. Department of State
Case Number: 6:2021cv00322
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: in light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #19 filed by Plaintiff, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/6/2021. (BRS)
April 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Mohammed Bilal Khan (Poudat, Maud)
March 18, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by Mohammed Bilal Khan. U.S. Attorney served on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/18/2021 (SPM).
March 18, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF of service by Mohammed Bilal Khan as to Consular Section Chief, U.S. Consulate, Casablanca, Morocco on 3/1/2021 (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/18/2021 (SPM). (Duplicate of #16)
March 18, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF of service by Mohammed Bilal Khan as to Consular Section Chief, U.S. Consulate, Casablanca, Morocco on 3/1/2021 (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/18/2021 (SPM).
March 18, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF of service by Mohammed Bilal Khan as to Director, National Visa Center, U.S. Department of State on 3/1/2021 (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/18/2021 (SPM).
March 18, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Mohammed Bilal Khan as to U.S. Attorney General on 3/1/2021 (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/18/2021 (SPM).
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Mohammed Bilal Khan as to Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services on 2/25/2021 (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/18/2021 (SPM).
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Mohammed Bilal Khan as to Secretary, U.S. Department of State on 3/1/2021 (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/18/2021 (SPM).
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Mohammed Bilal Khan as to Secretary, Department of Homeland Security on 2/25/2021 (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/18/2021 (SPM).
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mohammed Bilal Khan. (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 3/15/2021 (SPM).
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a complete Certificate of Interested Persons within seven days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/12/2021. (BRS)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Mohammed Bilal Khan. (Poudat, Maud)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 2/19/2021. (MB)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/18/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Consular Section Chief, U.S. Consulate, Casablanca, Morocco, Director, National Visa Center, U.S. Department of State, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney. (SPM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0322-JA-GJK. (SJB)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mohammed Bilal Khan. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17899316) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit)(Poudat, Maud) Modified on 2/18/2021 (SPM).
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 2/18/2021 (SPM).
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL (Poudat, Maud) Modified on 2/18/2021 (SPM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Secretary, U.S. Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Bilal Khan
Represented By: Maud Poudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Petrovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis L. Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandra Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Palsrok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consular Section Chief, U.S. Consulate, Casablanca, Morocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, National Visa Center, U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?