Guillen Loaiza et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera and Anyeen Guillen Loaiza
Defendant: Jean King, Debra A. Rogers, Attorney General US Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Tracey Renaud, Alejandro Mayorkas, Varsenik Papazian, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, U.S. Immigration and Custsoms Enforcement Division, Attorney General of the U.S., Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Director, Miami Asylum Office, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services and Director, Potomac Service Center, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 6:2021cv00522
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gregory A Presnell
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #21 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/11/2021. (LAM)
May 7, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco)
April 14, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Order by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera. (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco)
April 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera. Related case(s): Yes (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco)
April 14, 2021 Filing 18 (WRONG PDF. REFILED AT #20) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Order by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera. (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/15/2021 (RDO).
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF of service on 4/1/2021 as to Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF of service on 4/1/2021 as to the Director, Potomac Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF of service on 4/1/2021 as to the Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Chief Counsel, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF of service on 4/1/2021 as to the Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF of service on 4/1/2021 as to the Director, Miami Asylum Office, US Citizenship and Immigration Services by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service on 4/2/2021 as to the Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service on 4/2/2021 as to the Office of the US Attorney General by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed on 3/29/2021 as to the United States of America by Monica Mendez Aguilera, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Anyeen Guillen Loaiza. (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED) RETURN of service executed on 04/01/2021 by Monica Mendez Aguilera, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Anyeen Guillen Loaiza as to Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Director, Miami Asylum Office, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, Potomac Service Center, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, U.S. Immigration and Custsoms Enforcement Division. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED) SUMMONS returned executed by Monica Mendez Aguilera, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Anyeen Guillen Loaiza. Attorney General of the U.S. served on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 4/13/2021 (RDO).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITITAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/29/2021. (DS) (DS).
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. (RDO) Modified on 3/26/2021 (TNP).
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons as to the US Attorney General by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera. (Already issued) (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 3/24/2021 (RDO).
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint for relief pursuant to the Administrative procedures act by Anyeen Guillen Loaiza, Veronica Guillen Mendez, Monica Mendez Aguilera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-0522-GAP-LRH. (SJB)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for relief pursuant to the Administrative procedures act against all Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-18031152) filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Summons Alejandro Mayorkas, #8 Proposed Summons Merrick Garland, #9 Proposed Summons Tracy Renaud, #10 Proposed Summons Debra A. Rogers, #11 Proposed Summons Varsenik Papazian, #12 Proposed Summons Jean King, #13 Proposed Summons Tae Johnson, #14 Proposed Summons Civil Process Clerk)(Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 3/23/2021 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillen Loaiza et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Guillen Mendez
Represented By: Francisco Fraerly Symphorien-Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Mendez Aguilera
Represented By: Francisco Fraerly Symphorien-Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anyeen Guillen Loaiza
Represented By: Francisco Fraerly Symphorien-Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General US Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tae Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsenik Papazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, U.S. Immigration and Custsoms Enforcement Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Miami Asylum Office, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Potomac Service Center, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?