Entrust Solutions, LLC et al v. First National Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: JONATHAN YASKO, ENTRUST SOLUTIONS, LLC and ENTRUST ENTERPRISES, LLC
Defendant: FIRST NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 6:2021cv00526
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Richard F. Joyce, Esquire. (Gerber, Douglas)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss; discharging #19 Order to Show Cause. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 5/13/2021. (MKH)
May 13, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against First National Title Insurance Company filed by Entrust Solutions, LLC, Jonathan Yasko, Entrust Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Gerber, Douglas)
May 7, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #19 Order to show cause filed by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Entrust Solutions, LLC, Jonathan Yasko. (Gerber, Douglas)
May 6, 2021 Filing 23 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (TNP)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/3/2021. (MKH)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/16/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/16/2021. Discovery due by 4/8/2022. Dispositive motions due by 5/6/2022. Pretrial statement due by 9/2/2022. All other motions due by 9/9/2022. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 11/5/2021. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 12/3/2021. Bench Trial set for 10/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/28/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 5/6/2021. (MKH)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to show cause as to Plaintiffs Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Entrust Solutions, LLC, Jonathan Yasko. On or before May 13, 2021, Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by written response why they failed to timely respond to Defendant's motion dismiss (Doc. #14). With the response, Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to respond to Defendant's motion. Failure to timely do so may result in the Court granting the motion as unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 5/6/2021. (MKH)
May 4, 2021 Filing 18 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-00526-LRH. Judge John Antoon II no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/4/2021. (BRS)
May 3, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by First National Title Insurance Company. (Kiley, Timothy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kiley, Timothy)
April 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by First National Title Insurance Company. (Kiley, Timothy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement re #6 Initial case order by First National Title Insurance Company (Kiley, Timothy) Modified on 4/1/2021 (SPM).
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by First National Title Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Kiley, Timothy)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by First National Title Insurance Company re #7 Notice of Removal (Kiley, Timothy) Modified on 3/31/2021 (SPM).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before April 13, 2021. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/31/2021. (BRS)
March 31, 2021 Set deadlines: for First National Title Insurance Company. Answer due by 4/13/2021. (SPM)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement re #6 Initial case order by Entrust Enterprises, LLC, Entrust Solutions, LLC, Jonathan Yasko. (Squires-Binford, Grey) Modified on 3/30/2021 (SPM).
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by First National Title Insurance Company. (Kiley, Timothy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (SPM). Modified on 3/30/2021 (SPM).
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 Amended COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Seminole County, Florida, case number 2021-CA-000603 filed in State Court on 03-02-2021. filed by First National Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiley, Timothy) Modified on 3/30/2021 (SPM).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CASE ORDER for both Plaintiffs and Defendant - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/25/2021. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Notice of Removal, ordering First National Title Insurance Company to file an amended notice of removal by April 2, 2021. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/24/2021. (EK)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Timothy J. Kiley that Form JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet is required for the Clerk of Court to initiate a civil docket sheet. File the Civil Cover Sheet in this action using the Notice (Other) event. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-0526-JA-LRH. (SJB)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Seminole County, Florida, case number 2021CA000603 filed in State Court on 03/02/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-18039439 filed by FIRST NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 State Court COMPLAINT, #4 State Court Other Documents Verified Return of Service)(Kiley, Timothy)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE by FIRST NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 State Court Other Documents)(Kiley, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entrust Solutions, LLC et al v. First National Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN YASKO
Represented By: Douglas Paul Gerber
Represented By: Grey Squires-Binford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENTRUST SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Paul Gerber
Represented By: Grey Squires-Binford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENTRUST ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Paul Gerber
Represented By: Grey Squires-Binford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mya M. Hatchette
Represented By: Timothy James Kiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?