Colucci et al v. Health First, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Colucci, Kelly Baker and Vanessa Lorraine Skipper
Defendant: Health First, Inc.
Petitioner: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, Aetna Insurance Company of Connecticut and Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: ChoiceCare and Medfast Urgent Care Centers, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv00681
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
2 Judge: Robert M Norway
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re #175 Stipulation of Dismissal. All pending motions are denied as moot and all deadlines and hearings are terminated, except for Defendant's Motion for Sanctions (Doc. #176), which will remain pending until resolved. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/28/2023. (ALL)
March 27, 2023 Filing 176 MOTION for Sanctions by Health First, Inc. (Honkonen, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/27/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
March 23, 2023 Filing 175 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Kim, Jason)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REPORT ON STATUS CONFERENCE. See PDF Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/21/2023. (ECJ)
March 21, 2023 Filing 172 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/21/2023. (Digital/Zoom) (LDJ)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ENDORSED ORDER granting #169 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Robert D.W. Landon, III withdraws as counsel for Health First, Inc. The withdraw of counsel shall not be cited or relied upon as a basis to seek extensions of any deadlines in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/13/2023. (Norway, Robert)
March 10, 2023 Filing 170 Joint STATUS report by Health First, Inc. (Honkonen, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/13/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
March 10, 2023 Filing 169 MOTION for Robert D. W. Landon, III to Withdraw as Attorney by Health First, Inc. (Landon, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. Modified on 3/10/2023 to edit docket text (SRD).
March 8, 2023 Filing 168 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:21-cv-681-RBD-RMN. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #155 MOTION for Protective Order or Brief Stay of Action. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. (RPB)
February 28, 2023 Set deadline: Status Report due by 3/10/2023. (LDJ)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #164 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Case Management Conference via Videoconference. Case Management Conference will be held before the undersigned on Tuesday, March 21, 2023, at 10:00 A.M. by Zoom. A Zoom invitation will be sent separately. The parties are ORDERED to file a status report by March 10, 2023, to include whether Defendant's Motion for Protective Order or Brief Stay of Action (Doc. 155) is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/28/2023. (ECJ)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying #157 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/7/2023. (ALL)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply (Doc. #163). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/7/2023. (EP)
February 6, 2023 Filing 164 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Case Management Conference via Videoconference by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
February 6, 2023 Filing 163 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for leave to file reply in support of motion for leave to file Third Amended Complaint by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Berry, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
January 26, 2023 Filing 162 Amended RESPONSE to Motion re #155 MOTION for Protective Order or Brief Stay of Action filed by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker) Modified text on 1/27/2023 (LDJ).
January 24, 2023 Filing 161 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Amend Motion for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint filed by Health First, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Honkonen, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2023 Filing 160 RESPONSE to Motion re #155 MOTION for Protective Order or Brief Stay of Action filed by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker)
January 12, 2023 Filing 159 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robert Stephen Berry on behalf of Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. Lead Counsel: R. Stephen Berry. (Berry, Robert)
January 10, 2023 Filing 158 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Elizabeth B. Honkonen on behalf of Health First, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Elizabeth B. Honkonen. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2023 Filing 157 MOTION to Amend Motion for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - Email, #4 Exhibit D - Email, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt, Document Request)(Berry, Robert) Modified text on 1/11/2023 (LDJ).
January 10, 2023 Filing 156 NOTICE to counsel for All Parties of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ)
January 9, 2023 Filing 155 MOTION for Protective Order or Brief Stay of Action by Health First, Inc.. (Honkonen, Elizabeth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying #96 Motion to Certify Class. Plaintiffs' Objection (Doc. #134) is OVERRULED. The Magistrate Judge Order (Doc. #133) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/21/2022. (ALL)
December 10, 2022 Filing 153 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Nikki L. Peters. (NLP)
December 10, 2022 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Hearing held on November 21, 2022, before Judge David A. Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nikki Peters,Telephone number courttranscripts@outlook.com; 407-835-5815. Tape Number: Zoom audio recording. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 1/3/2023 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2023 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2023. (NLP)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting in part #140 Motion for Hearing / Settlement Conference as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 11/22/2022. (JW)
November 21, 2022 Filing 148 Minute entry. Hearing on Doc. #140. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker: on 11/21/2022. (DIGITAL/ZOOM) (JW) Modified on 11/21/2022 (JW).
November 15, 2022 Filing 147 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #140 STATUS report Update as to Open Issues as to Florida Blue's Subpoena Compliance and Request for a Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Notice sent to counsel via Zoom. (JW) (JW).
November 10, 2022 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Annette Norman re #144 Response by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Morreale, Frank)
November 10, 2022 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Frank Morreale re #144 Response by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plf subpoena to BCBSF, #2 Exhibit Morreale email dtd 7-14-22)(Morreale, Frank)
November 10, 2022 Filing 144 RESPONSE re #140 STATUS report Update as to Open Issues as to Florida Blue's Subpoena Compliance and Request for a Hearing filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Morreale, Frank)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ENDORSED ORDER granting #142 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Non party's response to Doc. 140 is due November 10, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 10/27/2022. (Baker, David)
October 26, 2022 Filing 142 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #140 STATUS report Update as to Open Issues as to Florida Blue's Subpoena Compliance and Request for a Hearing by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit emails)(Morreale, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
October 26, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Edward Morreale on behalf of Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. (Morreale, Frank)
October 25, 2022 Filing 140 STATUS report Update as to Open Issues as to Florida Blue's Subpoena Compliance and Request for a Hearing by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John M. Gale, Ph.D)(Berry, Robert) Modified text on 10/26/2022 (LDJ). Modified on 10/26/2022 (JW).
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' status report (doc. 137), it appears they may wish additional rulings from the Court for completion of discovery. To that end, any party wishing further relief with respect to the matters described in the status report shall file file an appropriate motion (compliant with Local Rule 3.01(g)) by October 25, 2022. Responses to any motions shall be filed within seven days. If requested, the Court will schedule a hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 10/18/2022. (Baker, David)
October 10, 2022 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #134 Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation Construing the Relevant Product Market Alleged to Deny Data and Document Discovery filed by Health First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Honkonen, Elizabeth) Modified text on 11/22/2022 (LDJ).
October 10, 2022 Filing 137 Joint STATUS report by Health First, Inc.. (Honkonen, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/11/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 7, 2022 Filing 136 Updated STATUS Report as to Negotiation Re: Aetna and Florida Blue Subpoena Compliance and Plaintiffs' Request for Hearing by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Berry, Robert) Modified on 10/11/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
October 3, 2022 Filing 135 Status of Negotiation as to Aetna and Florida Blue Subpoena Compliance by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Berry, Robert) Modified on 10/3/2022 to edit the docket text (RPB).
September 26, 2022 Filing 134 OBJECTION re #133 Order on Motion to Compel by Anthony Colucci and Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Berry, Robert) Modified to edit text on 9/27/2022 (LMF).
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying #126 Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 9/19/2022. (TNP)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER. Non-parties United Health Care Insurance Co. and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Co. are ORDERED to produce discovery as agreed to by the parties by October 14, 2022. Plaintiffs and Florida Blue and Aetna Insurance Co. are ORDERED to file a joint status report regarding production of discovery by October 3, 2022. Plaintiffs and Defendant Health First, Inc. are ORDERED to file a joint status report regarding production of custodian discovery by October 10, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 9/14/2022. (TNP)
September 14, 2022 Filing 131 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker: Discovery Hearing held on 9/14/2022. (Zoom / Digital) (TNP) (TNP).
September 12, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE of compliance re #127 Order on Motion for Hearing / Settlement Conference, by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Domingoes, Andrew)
September 9, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE of hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 9/14/2022 at 11:00 AM by Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. The Zoom link was provided to counsel by email. (ECJ)
September 1, 2022 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #126 Motion to Compel, filed by Health First, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Honkonen, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Hearing - Discovery Conference. The notice setting the Discovery Conference for September 14, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. will be entered separately. All responses and/or objections to Plaintiffs' discovery requests are due by September 9, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 8/22/2022. (TNP)
August 18, 2022 Filing 126 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Responses and Objections to Second Set of Requests for Production)(Byrd, Tucker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
August 18, 2022 Filing 125 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Discovery Conference by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Berry, Robert) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Text modified on 8/19/2022 (RDO).
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/14/2023 Dispositive motions due by 5/4/2023 Pretrial statement due by 9/14/2023 All other motions due by 8/31/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/15/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/15/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 10/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2022. (YG)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's Amended Unopposed Motion to Modify (Doc. #121). The Motion is GRANTED in that the Court will extend the remaining deadlines by six months. In all other respects, the Motion is DENIED. An amended Case Management and Scheduling Order will be entered separately. No further extensions will be granted absent exceptional good cause. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2022. (EP)
August 3, 2022 Filing 122 STATUS report Regarding Document Production from Aetna by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker)
August 3, 2022 Filing 121 AMENDED MOTION to Modify #41 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of R. Stephenm Berry)(Byrd, Tucker) Text modified on 8/4/2022 (RDO).
July 28, 2022 Set deadline: Status Report due by 8/3/2022. (LDJ)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying without prejudice #114 Non-Party Aetna's Motion for Extension of Time to Object to Subpoena Duces Tecum and Extend Production Date; denying without prejudice #115 Motion to Modify Case Management Order. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file their amended motion to modify the deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order by August 3, 2022. They are further directed to file by August 3, 2022, a status report with respect document production from Aetna. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 7/28/2022. (EC1)
July 28, 2022 Filing 118 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/28/2022. (Digital) (RN)
July 27, 2022 Filing 117 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 06/09-10/2022. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Byrd, Tucker)
July 25, 2022 Filing 116 NOTICE of hearing: Status Conference set for 7/28/2022 at 10:00 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. A Zoom link will be sent to counsel by separate email. (TNP)
July 22, 2022 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION to Modify #41 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order, by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker)
July 13, 2022 Filing 114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File objections to subpoena and to extend production date by Aetna Insurance Company of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gallagher, Allison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
July 11, 2022 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Dr. Gale's Reply Report re #96 MOTION to Certify Class (Doc. 96-4) filed by Health First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Expert Report of Christopher A. Vellturo, Ph.D.)(Honkonen, Elizabeth) Modified text on 7/12/2022 (LDJ).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting in part #97 Motion to Strike. Defendant may have Dr. Vellturo supplement his report and submit a response to the Reply Report on or before July 11, 2022. Defendant is awarded motion costs of $500 to be paid forthwith. The Motion to Strike is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 7/5/2022. (TNP)
June 30, 2022 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Berry, Robert) Modified link on 6/30/2022 (LDJ).
June 29, 2022 Set deadline as to #96 MOTION to Certify Class . Replies due by 7/7/2022. (LDJ)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply (Doc. #108). Plaintiffs may file a reply not to exceed five pages by Thursday, July 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/29/2022. (EP)
June 27, 2022 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #108 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion for Class Certification filed by Health First, Inc.. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2022 Filing 108 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion for Class Certification by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker.
June 24, 2022 Filing 107 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:21-cv-0681-RBD-DAB. US Magistrate Judge Gregory J Kelly no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #97 MOTION to Strike #96 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Expert Reply Report of John M. Gale, Ph.D., and all References to the Reply Report from Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification,. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. (SJB)
June 21, 2022 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #96 Motion to Certify Class, filed by Health First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colucci Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Gale Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Skipper Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Decl. of S. Ronan (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit E - Decl. of R. Landon, #6 Exhibit F - Decl. of J. Sterling, #7 Exhibit G - Vellturo Expert Report)(Honkonen, Elizabeth) Modified text on 6/22/2022 (LDJ).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ENDORSED ORDER granting #103 Motion to Seal. Based on the confidential and sensitive medical information contained in the proposed submission, filing under seal is justified. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 6/16/2022. (Baker, David)
June 15, 2022 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Patient Documents and Information by Health First, Inc.. (Ceballos-Levy, Christina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J Kelly.
June 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #91 Motion to Compel production of documents. The motion has been resolved and withdrawn. The hearing scheduled for June 13, 2002, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 6/11/2022. (Baker, David)
June 10, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Health First, Inc. re #91 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Duces Tecum Responses from Non-Party Medfast filed by Health First, Inc. and Request for Cancellation of Hearing [DE 99] (Landon, Robert)
June 9, 2022 Filing 100 NOTICE of compliance re #99 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Health First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Landon, Robert)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #91 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Duces Tecum Responses from Non-Party Medfast. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2022 at 11:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 D before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 6/8/2022. (TNP)
June 3, 2022 Filing 98 RESPONSE to Motion re #97 MOTION to Strike #96 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Expert Reply Report of John M. Gale, Ph.D., and all References to the Reply Report from Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, filed by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Report of Dr. John Gale, #2 Exhibit Declaration of R. Stephen Berry)(Berry, Robert) Modified text on 6/6/2022 (LDJ).
May 31, 2022 Filing 97 MOTION to Strike #96 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Expert Reply Report of John M. Gale, Ph.D., and all References to the Reply Report from Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Supplemental Expert Report and Additional Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Health First, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Excerpts of Gale's Deposition)(Ceballos-Levy, Christina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 6/1/2022 (LDJ).
May 20, 2022 Filing 96 MOTION to Certify Class by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of John M. Gale, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts, Vanessa Skipper Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts, Anthony Colucci Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - Expert Reply Report of John M. Gale, Ph.D., #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Vanessa Skipper, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Anthony Colucci, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of R. Stephen Berry, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Jason H. Kim, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Tucker H. Byrd, #10 Exhibit J - Excerpts, Christopher A. Vellturo Deposition Transcript)(Berry, Robert) Modified text on 5/20/2022 (LDJ).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ENDORSED ORDER granting #94 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Min K. Cho terminated as counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 5/3/2022. (Baker, David)
May 2, 2022 Filing 94 MOTION for Min Cho to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Cho, Min) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 25, 2022 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT of David T. Williams re: #92 Response to motion to Compel Subpoena Duces Tecum Responses from Non-Party MedFast by Medfast Urgent Care Centers, LLC. (Volk, David)
April 25, 2022 Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #91 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Duces Tecum Responses from Non-Party Medfast filed by Medfast Urgent Care Centers, LLC. (Volk, David)
April 12, 2022 Filing 91 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Duces Tecum Responses from Non-Party Medfast by Health First, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Landon, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #86 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS THAT ARE IN DEFENDANT'S POSSESSION, CUSTODY OR CONTROL THAT WERE PRODUCED, USED OR SPONSORED BY THE PARTIES IN OMNI HEALTHCARE, INC. V. HEALTH FIRST, INC. It is ORDERED as follows: 1. The Unopposed Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 86) is GRANTED; and 2. On or before March 23, 2022, Defendant shall produce the Omni Documents to Plaintiffs as "Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only" discovery material in accordance with the Confidentiality Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/9/2022. (CRC)
February 15, 2022 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE of Providing Copy of Unopposed Motion to Compel and Order Directing All Interested Parties to File Responses to Motion to Compel re #88 Order directing response to motion by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Cho, Min) Modified text on 2/16/2022 (LDJ).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER directing interested parties to respond to #86 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Documents that are in Defendant's Possession that were Produced, Used or Sponsored by the Parties in Omni Healthcare, Inc. v. Health First, Inc. All interested third parties shall file their responses to the UnopposedMotion to Compel on or before Monday February 28, 2022; and 2. Plaintiff shall provide a copy of the Unopposed Motion to Compel and this corresponding Order to any third party known to have an interest in the Unopposed Motion to Compel and thereafter Plaintiff shall provide certification of having done so with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/14/2022. (CRC)
February 9, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE of Serving Counsel for Omni a Copy of the Motion to Compel Documents re #86 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Documents that are in Defendant's Possession that were Produced, Used or Sponsored by the Parties in Omni Healthcare, Inc. v. Health First, Inc. by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Cho, Min) Modified text on 2/10/2022 (LDJ).
February 9, 2022 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Documents that are in Defendant's Possession that were Produced, Used or Sponsored by the Parties in Omni Healthcare, Inc. v. Health First, Inc. by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cho, Min) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
February 8, 2022 Filing 85 AMENDED ANSWER to Second #53 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Health First, Inc.. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #69 Motion to Compel production of documents. Based on the representations in the Notice filed today (doc. no. 83), the parties and non-parties have resolved their dispute, and the hearing set for 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/1/2022. (Baker, David)
February 1, 2022 Filing 83 Second Amended Local Rule 3.01(g) CERTIFICATION and Joint Request to Cancel Hearing on February 1, 2022 re #79 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #80 Compliance notice, #69 MOTION to Compel Designated "Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only" Discovery , 81 Notice (Other) by Min K. Cho on behalf of Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Cho, Min) Modified text on 2/1/2022 (LDJ).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #56 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Motion is GRANTED as to Count III (Doc. 53, 147-53), which is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Motion is DENIED as to Count II (id. 140-46) and in all other respects.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/24/2022. (YG)
January 21, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE regarding Telephonic Motion Hearing scheduled for 2/1/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Parties who are required to attend the hearing shall call five minutes before the start of the hearing, 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8619612; Security Code: 020122 (ECJ)
January 21, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of compliance re #79 Order Setting Hearing on Motion by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Domingoes, Andrew)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on Motion #69 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DESIGNATED"CONFIDENTIAL-ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY" DISCOVERY : Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2022 at 11:00 AM. Plaintiff shall serve this Order on Defendant and all third-party Health Care Payors and immediately file the return of service with the Clerk of Court. The parties and third-parties shall arrange to place a joint telephone call on a single telephone line to 888-684-8852 five minutes prior to the hearing. The parties must contact Courtroom Deputy Kim Anderson before the hearing to obtain the access code and security code. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 1/20/2022. (CRC)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: Defendant's Objection #66 is OVERRULED IN PART ANDSUSTAINED IN PART. The MJ Order #65 is REVERSED IN PART AND AFFIRMEDIN PART. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/11/2022. (YG)
December 23, 2021 Filing 77 RESPONSE to Motion re #69 MOTION to Compel Designated "Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only" Discovery filed by ChoiceCare. (Joffe, Jason)
December 23, 2021 Filing 76 Amended Local Rule 3.01(g) CERTIFICATION re #74 Notice (Other), #75 Notice (Other), #73 Memorandum in opposition, #69 MOTION to Compel Designated "Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only" Discovery by Min K. Cho on behalf of Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Cho, Min) Modified on 12/27/2021 (matched text to pleading) (KNC).
December 21, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE by UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company re #73 Memorandum in opposition -- Non-Party UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company's Joinder in Non-Party Cigna's Objection to Motion to Compel (Furman, Wendy)
December 20, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Filing Aetna Health, Inc.'s correspondence by Health First, Inc. re #69 MOTION to Compel Designated "Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only" Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence)(Landon, Robert) Modified text on 12/21/2021 (LDJ).
December 13, 2021 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #70 Notice (Other) filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Bradford, Patrick)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER granting #71 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE, provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/7/2021. (CRC)
December 3, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION for Matthew S. Weiler to appear pro hac vice by Anthony Colucci. (Domingoes, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
November 29, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Serving Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Designated "Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only" Discovery by Health First, Inc. (Honkonen, Elizabeth) Modified text on 11/30/2021 (LDJ).
November 23, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION to Compel Designated "Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only" Discovery by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Domingoes, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
November 23, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE to counsel Matthew S. Weiler Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (copies mailed)
November 22, 2021 Filing 67 RESPONSE re #66 Appeal of magistrate judge ruling to district court filed by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Domingoes, Andrew)
November 8, 2021 Filing 66 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge ruling to District Court by Health First, Inc. re #65 Order on Motion to Compel (Ceballos-Levy, Christina)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying #45 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO DEFENDANT'S DOCUMENT REQUESTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/25/2021. (MB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying #44 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO ANSWER DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES #6 AND #7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/25/2021. (MB)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO PROVIDE COMPLIANT RULE 26(a)(1)(A) DISCLOSURES. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 10/15/2021. (MB)
October 8, 2021 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Counts II and III of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. 53) filed by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Cho, Min)
October 5, 2021 Filing 61 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Domingoes on behalf of Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Domingoes, Andrew) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (LDJ).
October 5, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker H. Byrd on behalf of Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Byrd, Tucker)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ENDORSED ORDER granting #58 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Counts II and III of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. 53). Responses due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/17/2021. (KRR)
September 15, 2021 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/8/21 to File Response/Reply as to #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Counts II and III of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. 53) by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 9/16/2021 (LDJ).
September 10, 2021 Filing 57 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #53 Amended Complaint by Health First, Inc..(Honkonen, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Counts II and III of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. 53) by Health First, Inc.. (Ceballos-Levy, Christina)
September 3, 2021 Filing 55 Remark: Doc. #54 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/2/2021. (LLM)
September 1, 2021 Filing 54 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. Amendment to #15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Cho, Min) Modified text on 9/1/2021 (LDJ).
August 25, 2021 Filing 53 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against Health First, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Berry, Robert) Modified text on 8/25/2021 (LDJ).
August 20, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Amie First. (ARF)
August 20, 2021 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on July 21, 2021, before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Court Reporter Amie R. First, RDR, CRR, CRC, CPE, AmieFirst.CourtReporter@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 9/10/2021 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2021 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2021. (ARF)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO OPERATIVE COMPLAINT. Health First, Inc. answer or response due 9/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/20/2021. (KRR)
August 19, 2021 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/10/21 to File Answer to Operative Complaint by Health First, Inc. (Ceballos-Levy, Christina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 8/20/2021 (LDJ).
August 12, 2021 Set deadline: Amended Complaint due by 8/25/2021 (LDJ)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #26 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #37 Motion to Stay Discovery. By Wednesday, August 25, 2021, Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint correcting the deficiencies identified in this Order. Failure to so file will result in this case proceeding on the First, Second, and Fourth Causes of Action only. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/12/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
August 12, 2021 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Defendant's Interrogatories #6 and #7 filed by Anthony Colucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Response to Motion to Compel Interrogatories)(Cho, Min)
August 12, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #45 MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Defendant's Document Requests filed by Anthony Colucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Motion to Compel Documents, #2 Exhibit B- Motion to Compel Documents)(Cho, Min)
August 9, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Defendant's Document Requests by Health First, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Landon, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
August 9, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Answer Defendant's Interrogatories #6 and #7 by Health First, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Landon, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
July 28, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 6/9 and 6/10/22 before Jay M. Cohen. (Arnold, Richard)
July 23, 2021 Filing 42 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LDJ)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/19/2021 Joinder of Parties due by 11/19/2021 Discovery due by 10/14/2022 Dispositive motions due by 11/4/2022 Pretrial statement due by 3/9/2023 All other motions due by 2/23/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/15/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/15/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/30/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/23/2021. (BIA)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #33 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/21/2021. (BIA)
July 21, 2021 Filing 39 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/21/2021. Court Reporter: Amie First (BIA)
July 20, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Stay Discovery all Count III Discovery, or, Alternatively, Quash Subpoena to Non-Party Adventist filed by Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Cho, Min)
July 19, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay Discovery all Count III Discovery, or, Alternatively, Quash Subpoena to Non-Party Adventist by Health First, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Landon, Robert)
July 16, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt.13) filed by Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker)
July 12, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Min K. Cho on behalf of Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Cho, Min)
July 2, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE re #33 MOTION to Amend Case Management Order Opposition (in Part) to Plaintiffs' Proposed Amendments to Case Management Order filed by Health First, Inc. (Honkonen, Elizabeth) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (LDJ).
June 29, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend Case Management Report by Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. Amendment to #27 Case Management Report . (Berry, Robert) Modified text on 6/29/2021 (LDJ). Modified text on 7/6/2021 (LDJ).
June 29, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Compliant Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures filed by Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Berry, Robert)
June 24, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Compliant Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures by Health First, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Landon, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 22, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of hearing: re: #27 Case Management Report. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (BIA)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply re #26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt.13) Responses due by 7/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/16/2021. (Smith, Thomas)
June 16, 2021 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt.13) by Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Byrd, Tucker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 14, 2021 Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Berry, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt.13) by Health First, Inc.. (Ceballos-Levy, Christina)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 6/11/2021. (Baker, David)
June 10, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Jason H. Kim to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18351957 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Meyer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
May 28, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker H. Byrd on behalf of Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper (Byrd, Tucker)
May 7, 2021 Filing 22 Remark: Doc. #21 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/7/2021. (LLM)
May 6, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Order pdf by Health First, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Holmes Regional Medical Center, Inc., Other Affiliate Cape Canaveral Hospital, Inc., Other Affiliate Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation, Other Affiliate Health First Physicians, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Health Plans, Inc., Other Affiliate Cape Health Properties, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Holding Corp., Other Affiliate Health First Medical Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Holmes Regional Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate Hospice of Health First, Inc., Other Affiliate Memory Disorder Clinic, Inc., Other Affiliate Viera Medical Plaza at Viera Health Park, LLC, Other Affiliate Viera Hospital, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Insurance, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Medical Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Chiron Urgent Care, LLC, Other Affiliate Health First Administrative Plans, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Commercial Plans, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Physicians Real Estate, LLC, Other Affiliate Brevard Distribution, LLC, Other Affiliate The Ophthalmology Center of Brevard, L.P. d/b/a ASC of Brevard, Other Affiliate Privia Management Services Organization, LLC, Other Affiliate Doctor's Surgical Partnership, Ltd. d/b/a Melbourne Same-Day Surgery Center, Other Affiliate Physicians' Surgical Partnership, Inc., Other Affiliate Coastal Health Systems of Brevard, Inc., Other Affiliate Sea Pines Rehabilitation Hospital Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Doctors GI Partnership, Ltd. d/b/a Melbourne GI Center, Other Affiliate Physicians GI Partnership, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Foundation II, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Physician Specialties, Inc., Other Affiliate Health First Privia Medical Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Richard Alan Arnold, Other Affiliate Robert D. W. Landon III, Other Affiliate Deborah S. Corbishley, Other Affiliate Elizabeth B. Honkonen, Other Affiliate Christina M. Ceballos-Levy, Other Affiliate Kenny Nachwalter, P.A. for Health First, Inc.. (Landon, Robert)
May 6, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Health First, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Landon, Robert)
May 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Richard Alan Arnold, Robert D. W. Landon, III, Deborah S. Corbishley, Elizabeth B. Honkonen, and Christina M. Ceballos-Levy Appearance by Robert D.W. Landon, III on behalf of Health First, Inc. (Landon, Robert)
May 6, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/5/2021 by Anthony Colucci, Kelly Baker, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper as to Health First, Inc.. (Berry, Robert)
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 Remark: Doc. #15 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/29/2021. (LLM)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/28/2021. (HMK)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Order pdf by Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Berry, Robert)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. Related case(s): Yes (Berry, Robert)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Health First, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Anthony Colucci, Kelly Baker, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper.(Berry, Robert)
April 21, 2021 Set deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 5/5/2021 (SPM)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Robert Stephen Berry. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Counsel must take the tutorial offered on the Middle District of Florida's website before using the CM/ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/21/2021. (HMK)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Wednesday, May 5, 2021 Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint correcting the deficiencies identified in this Order. Failure to timely file will result in the closure of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/21/2021. (BIA)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 Amended MOTION for Robert Stephen Berry to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Meyer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER denying #7 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c)(4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/21/2021. (HMK)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/20/2021. (BIA)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Robert Stephen Berry to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Meyer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER denying #4 MOTION FOR APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c) requiring counsel to affirm he is not a member in good standing of the Florida Bar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 4/20/2021. (HMK)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Health First, Inc. (SPM)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Robert Stephen Berry to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18148316 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Meyer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0681-RBD-GJK. (SJB)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Kelly Baker, Anthony Colucci, Vanessa Lorraine Skipper. (Meyer, Ronald)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18147923) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meyer, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colucci et al v. Health First, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Colucci
Represented By: Ronald G. Meyer
Represented By: Robert Stephen Berry
Represented By: Jason H. Kim
Represented By: Scottie McPherson
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Wages
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Min K. Cho
Represented By: Andrew Michael Domingoes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Baker
Represented By: Ronald G. Meyer
Represented By: Robert Stephen Berry
Represented By: Jason H. Kim
Represented By: Scottie McPherson
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Wages
Represented By: Andrew Michael Domingoes
Represented By: Min K. Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Lorraine Skipper
Represented By: Ronald G. Meyer
Represented By: Robert Stephen Berry
Represented By: Jason H. Kim
Represented By: Scottie McPherson
Represented By: Tucker H. Byrd
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Wages
Represented By: Andrew Michael Domingoes
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Min K. Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health First, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Sampieri Corbishley
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Honkonen
Represented By: Richard Alan Arnold
Represented By: Robert D.W. Landon, III
Represented By: Christina M. Ceballos-Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick A. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aetna Insurance Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Allison Paige Gallagher
Represented By: Patrick Sherman Brathwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Edward Morreale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ChoiceCare
Represented By: Jason Daniel Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Medfast Urgent Care Centers, LLC
Represented By: David Joseph Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?