U.S. Bank, National Association v. Titans Group of Seminole County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Defendant: Lina M. Olarte-Lavine, Darrin C. Lavine, Sandy Lane Reserve Homeowners Association, Inc., Titans Group of Seminole County, Florida, Lina Lavine and PNC Bank, NA Successor by Merger to RBC Bank
Case Number: 6:2021cv00715
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by U.S. Bank, National Association Notice of Filing Case Management Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Uniform Case Management Report)(Wolf, Brian)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Defendant Darrin C. Lavine's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Objection to Motion for Remand Out of Time. The Court accepts Mr. Lavine's response at Docket Entry #10 as timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/23/2021. (RMN)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Darrin C. Lavine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LDJ)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Darrin C. Lavine. (LDJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd.
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by U.S. Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, National Association. (Wolf, Brian)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by U.S. Bank, National Association. (Wolf, Brian)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Alexander Wolf on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association (Wolf, Brian)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Richard Bowyer on behalf of U.S. Bank, National Association (Bowyer, Jason)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/4/2021. (RMF)ctp
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER on Discovery Motions Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/30/2021. (JLS)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seminole County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-002063 filed in State Court on 7/1/2019. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ORL097866) filed by Darrin C. Lavine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B part 1 - State Court Other Documents, #3 Exhibit B part 2 - State Court Other Documents, #4 Exhibit B part 3 - State Court Other Documents, #5 Exhibit C, #6 State Court COMPLAINT, #7 State Court ANSWER, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association v. Titans Group of Seminole County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina M. Olarte-Lavine
Represented By: Timothy Richard Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin C. Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Lane Reserve Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titans Group of Seminole County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Lavine
Represented By: Timothy Richard Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, NA Successor by Merger to RBC Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Vanessa D. Sloat-Rogers
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wolf
Represented By: Jason Richard Bowyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?