Theodore v. Purecycle Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William C. Theodore
Defendant: Michael Otworth, Purecycle Technologies, Inc. and Tasmin Ettefagh
Case Number: 6:2021cv00809
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 19 Order no pdf, 20 Order no pdf filed by Tasmin Ettefagh, Michael Otworth, Purecycle Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobsen, Joni)
July 8, 2021 Filing 23 Entered in Error.
July 7, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 19 Order no pdf, 20 Order no pdf filed by William C. Theodore. (O'Brien, Cullin)
July 7, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION and Memorandum of Law Regarding Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Tingley, Amy) Modified text on 7/7/2021 (MEJ). Modified on 7/9/2021 (GNB).
July 7, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Show Cause Response due by 7/13/2021 (MEJ)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be consolidated with 6:21-cv-809. Response due on or by July 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/6/2021. (JRR)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why 6:20-cv-818 should not be consolidated with this case. Response due on or by July 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/6/2021. (JRR)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Joni S. Jacobsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Counsel must take the tutorial offered on the Middle District of Florida's website before using the CM/ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/29/2021. (HMK)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for David H. Kistenbroker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Counsel must take the tutorial offered on the Middle District of Florida's website before using the CM/ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/29/2021. (HMK)
June 29, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Joni S. Jacobsen to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18418041 for $150 by Tasmin Ettefagh, Michael Otworth, Purecycle Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tingley, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 29, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for David H. Kistenbroker to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18417978 for $150 by Tasmin Ettefagh, Michael Otworth, Purecycle Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tingley, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly.
June 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy S. Tingley on behalf of Tasmin Ettefagh, Michael Otworth, Purecycle Technologies, Inc. (Tingley, Amy)
May 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by William C. Theodore. Related case(s): Yes (O'Brien, Cullin)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 6] Order by William C. Theodore. (O'Brien, Cullin) Modified on 5/28/2021 (RDO).
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 (WRONG EVENT CODE. REFILED AT #13) NOTICE by William C. Theodore Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (O'Brien, Cullin) Modified on 5/28/2021 (RDO).
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/19/21 by William C. Theodore as to Michael Otworth. (O'Brien, Cullin)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/19/21 by William C. Theodore as to Purecycle Technologies, Inc.. (O'Brien, Cullin)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/19/21 by William C. Theodore as to Tasmin Ettefagh. (O'Brien, Cullin)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER re #6 Order. The parties are DIRECTED to confer regarding deadlines pertinent to a motion for class certification and advise the Court of agreeable deadlines in their case management report. The deadlines should include a deadline for (1) disclosure of expert reports - class action, plaintiff and defendant; (2) discovery - class action; (3) motion for class certification; (4) response to motion for class certification; and (5) reply to motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/20/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/20/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/13/2021. (HMK)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (MEJ)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by William C. Theodore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(O'Brien, Cullin)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0809-PGB-GJK. (SJB)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18235850) filed by William C. Theodore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certification, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Defendants)(O'Brien, Cullin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theodore v. Purecycle Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Theodore
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Otworth
Represented By: Amy S. Tingley
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Joni S. Jacobsen
Represented By: Matthew Justin Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purecycle Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Amy S. Tingley
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Joni S. Jacobsen
Represented By: Matthew Justin Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasmin Ettefagh
Represented By: Amy S. Tingley
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Joni S. Jacobsen
Represented By: Matthew Justin Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?