Samuels v. WMC Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Kevin Samuels
Defendant: Tyler T. Stiglich, Kondaur Capital Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Systems, GE Holdings Inc., GQ Holding 1329, LLC, Ninth Judicial Circuit Court of Florida and WMC Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv00870
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued as to GQ Holding 1329, LLC, Ninth Judicial Circuit Court of Florida. (KNC)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint filed by Gregory Kevin Samuels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Patrick Hahn on behalf of Kondaur Capital Corporation (Hahn, Christopher)
July 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Joinder to Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Kondaur Capital Corporation re #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint , #15 Notice to take judicial notice, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint (Hahn, Christopher) Modified on 7/7/2021 (KNC).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 7/2/2021. (TYI)
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 Third MOTION for Jamie L. Ackerman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18432321 for $150 by GE Holdings Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admissions Attorney Certification)(Sosa, Jose) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by GE Holdings Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC. (Sosa, Jose)
July 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by GE Holdings Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Publication, #5 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Sosa, Jose)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by GE Holdings Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC. (Sosa, Jose)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/30/2021. (TYI)
June 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint by Tyler T. Stiglich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(Hatchette, Mya) Modified text on 6/29/2021 (TNP).
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Jamie L. Ackerman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18413906 for $150 by GE Holdings Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admissions Attorney Certification)(Sosa, Jose) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for a Civil Case with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tyler T. Stiglich. (Hatchette, Mya)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mya M. Hatchette on behalf of Tyler T. Stiglich (Hatchette, Mya)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/24/2021. (TYI)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18396953 for $150 for Jamie L. Ackerman, Esq. by GE Holdings Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admissions Attorney Certification)(Sosa, Jose) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose D. Sosa on behalf of GE Holdings Inc., WMC Mortgage, LLC (Sosa, Jose)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Gregory Kevin Samuels. (DS)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GE Holdings Inc., GQ Holding 1329, LLC, Kondaur Capital Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Systems, Ninth Judicial Circuit Court of Florida, Tyler T. Stiglich, WMC Mortgage, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Gregory Kevin Samuels. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Gregory Kevin Samuels.(DS)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/26/2021. (RMF)ctp
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ORL098299 filed by Gregory Kevin Samuels.(KNC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuels v. WMC Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler T. Stiglich
Represented By: Mya M. Hatchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kondaur Capital Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Jamie L. Ackerman
Represented By: Jose D. Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GQ Holding 1329, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninth Judicial Circuit Court of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMC Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Jamie L. Ackerman
Represented By: Jose D. Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Kevin Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?