DeFrank v. Blanco-Polanco et al
Plaintiff: Daniel DeFrank
Defendant: John Doe and Jose Blanco-Polanco
Petitioner: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2021cv00937
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Substitute Party - to Substitute the United States for Defendant Blanco-Polanco - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibits 1 - 6)(Smart, Adam)
July 8, 2021 Set deadline as to #2 MOTION to Substitute Party - to Substitute the United States for Defendant Blanco-Polanco -. Replies due by 7/15/2021. (LDJ)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 the United States' and Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines. Deadlines in this case are STAYED pending resolution of the United States' Motion to Substitute (Doc. 2). After resolution of the Motion to Substitute, Plaintiff will have twenty one (21) days to respond to the United States' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 21). Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/21. (EBU)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 the United States' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply. By Thursday, July 15, 2021, the United States may file a reply not to exceed fourteen (14) pages. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/8/21. (EBU)
July 6, 2021 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Until Court Rules on Motion to Substitute by United States of America. (Smart, Adam)
June 29, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Smart, Adam)
June 29, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply re: Motion to Substitute by United States of America. (Smart, Adam)
June 28, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Substitute Party - to Substitute the United States for Defendant Blanco-Polanco - AMENDED filed by Daniel DeFrank. (Zielinski, John)
June 28, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Substitute Party - to Substitute the United States for Defendant Blanco-Polanco - filed by Daniel DeFrank. (Zielinski, John)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/17/2021. (HMK)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 Remark: Doc. #14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/16/21. (EBU)
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Daniel DeFrank (Zielinski, John) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (LDJ).
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Order pdf by Daniel DeFrank. (Zielinski, John)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 6/15/2021. (Baker, David)
June 15, 2021 Reset deadline as to #2 MOTION to Substitute Party - to Substitute the United States for Defendant Blanco-Polanco -. Responses due by 6/28/2021 (LDJ)
June 14, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/28/21 to File Response/Reply to the United States' Motion to Substitute the United States for Defendant Jose Blanco-Polanco by Daniel DeFrank. (Zielinski, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. Modified text on 6/14/2021 (LDJ).
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 Remark: Doc. #9 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/14/21. (EBU)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by United States of America. Related case(s): Yes (Smart, Adam)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Order pdf by United States of America. (Smart, Adam)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Certification Under Rule 3.01(g)(3) - Notification that Motion is Opposed re #2 MOTION to Substitute Party - to Substitute the United States for Defendant Blanco-Polanco by United States of America. (Smart, Adam) Modified text on 6/14/2021 (LDJ).
June 4, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer due by 7/9/2021. (RDO)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/3/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 6/3/2021. (Baker, David)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT Certification Under Rule 3.01(g)(3) - Notification that Motion is Unopposed re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America. (Smart, Adam) Modified text on 6/3/2021 (MEJ).
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0937-RBD-GJK. (SJB)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by United States of America. (Smart, Adam)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party - to Substitute the United States for Defendant Blanco-Polanco - by United States of America. (Smart, Adam)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CA-004781-O filed in State Court on 05/06/2021. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Served Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acting U.S. Attorney Certification, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court COMPLAINT, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smart, Adam) Modified text on 6/1/2021 (LDJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeFrank v. Blanco-Polanco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Blanco-Polanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel DeFrank
Represented By: John W. Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?