Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Primo Management Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC and Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Defendant: Primo Management Group, Inc. and Israel Sanchez, Jr.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00973
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew S. Rapkowski is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/18/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
January 18, 2022 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew S. Rapkowski to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19129114 for $150 by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/19/2021. (RN)
September 22, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Richard F. Joyce, Esq. as mediator by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard)
September 10, 2021 Filing 23 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LDJ)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator no later than September 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/10/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2021 Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2021 Discovery due by 9/9/2022 Dispositive motions due by 10/10/2022 Pretrial statement due by 2/9/2023 All other motions due by 1/26/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/15/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/1/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/1/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/10/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
September 3, 2021 Filing 20 Remark: Doc. #19 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/2/2021. (LLM)
September 1, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard)
August 24, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses filed by Primo Management Group, Inc., Israel Sanchez, Jr. (Toscano, James)
August 23, 2021 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Epstein, Richard)
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #11 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Stepanova, Julia) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Primo Management Group, Inc., Israel Sanchez, Jr. Related case(s): Yes (Toscano, James) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (LDJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 Remark: Doc. #13 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2021. (LLM)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Primo Management Group, Inc., Israel Sanchez, Jr. (Toscano, James)
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 DEMAND for trial by jury by Primo Management Group, Inc., Israel Sanchez, Jr. (Toscano, James)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages by Primo Management Group, Inc., Israel Sanchez, Jr.(Toscano, James)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 Remark: Doc. #6 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/13/2021. (EJV)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on June 29, 2021 by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC as to Primo Management Group, Inc.. (Stepanova, Julia)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on June 29, 2021 by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC as to Israel Sanchez, Jr. (Stepanova, Julia)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC Related Case(s): No (Epstein, Richard) Modified text on 6/22/2021 (MEJ).
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order pdf by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Epstein, Richard)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/8/2021. (BIA) (CTP)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (LDJ)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Primo Management Group, Inc., Israel Sanchez, Jr. (LDJ)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-0973-RBD-DCI. (SJB)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Primo Management Group, Inc., Israel Sanchez, Jr with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18331040) filed by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Primo Management Group, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons Israel Sanchez, Jr.)(Epstein, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC et al v. Primo Management Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Julia Stepanova
Represented By: Matthew Scott Rapkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Julia Stepanova
Represented By: Matthew Scott Rapkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primo Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: James Steven Toscano
Represented By: Michael David Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Sanchez, Jr.
Represented By: James Steven Toscano
Represented By: Michael David Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?