Wall v. Centers For Disease Control & Prevention et al
Plaintiff: Lucas Wall
Defendant: Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority, Greater Orlando Aviation Authority and Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00975
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 277 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #276 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Judgment, #4 Docket Sheet)(RDO)
May 3, 2022 Filing 276 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #274 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #275 Judgment by Lucas Wall. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ORL103397. (RDO)
May 2, 2022 Filing 275 JUDGMENT in favor of Centers For Disease Control & Prevention and Department of Health & Human Services and against Lucas Wall. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RDO)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER denying #230 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #263 Federal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of the Federal Defendants and against Plaintiff. Defendants Greater Orlando Aviation Authority and Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and to thereafter close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/29/2022. (CPH)
April 25, 2022 Filing 273 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Middle District of Florida Vacates Federal Transportation Mask Mandate filed by Lucas Wall. (RDO)
April 25, 2022 Filing 272 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment: All Major Airlines Again Demand Termination of FTMM & ITTR filed by Lucas Wall. (RDO)
April 25, 2022 Filing 271 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment:4 Major Travel & Business Groups Demand Termination of FTMM & ITTR filed by Lucas Wall. (RDO)
April 12, 2022 Filing 270 REPLY in support of #263 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to #230 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Freidah, Andrew) Modified on 4/12/2022 (RDO).
April 4, 2022 Filing 269 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #263 Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in support of #230 Motion for Summary Judgment against CDC & HHS filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(RDO)
April 4, 2022 Filing 268 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (RDO)
March 28, 2022 Filing 267 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment:11 Major Airlines Demand Abolition of FTMM & ITTR by Lucas Wall. (RDO)
March 28, 2022 Filing 266 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Southwest Airlines Flight Attendants' Union Demands Abolition of FTMM by Lucas Wall. (RDO)
March 28, 2022 Filing 265 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment: International Air Transport Association Demands Abolition of FTMM & ITTR by Lucas Wall. (RDO)
March 28, 2022 Filing 264 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lucas Wall. (RDO)
March 25, 2022 Filing 263 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to #230 Motion for Summary Judgment by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - CDC - Transportation Mask Order, #2 Ex. 2 - CDC - Amended International Traveler Testing Order, #3 Ex. 3 - Funk & Wagnalls Dictionary, #4 Ex. 4 - Webster's Dictionary, #5 Ex. 5 - Dec. 24, 2021 Email from L. Wall to S. Pezzi)(Freidah, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 25, 2022 Filing 262 NOTICE by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record for Amended International Traveler Testing Order (Dec. 7, 2021) - Volume IV of IV (Pezzi, Stephen)
March 25, 2022 Filing 261 NOTICE by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record for Amended International Traveler Testing Order (Dec. 7, 2021) - Volume III of IV (Pezzi, Stephen)
March 25, 2022 Filing 260 NOTICE by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record for Amended International Traveler Testing Order (Dec. 7, 2021) - Volume II of IV (Pezzi, Stephen)
March 25, 2022 Filing 259 NOTICE by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record for Amended International Traveler Testing Order (Dec. 7, 2021) - Volume I of IV (Pezzi, Stephen)
March 25, 2022 Filing 258 NOTICE by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record for Amended International Traveler Testing Order (Dec. 7, 2021) (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Certification)(Pezzi, Stephen)
March 15, 2022 Filing 257 RESPONSE to Motion re #246 MOTION to Strike #233 MOTION to Dismiss Count 13 of Amended Complaint (Doc 188) , #232 MOTION to Dismiss Count 14 of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Culley, Sally)
March 15, 2022 Filing 256 RESPONSE in Opposition re #246 MOTION to Strike #233 MOTION to Dismiss Count 13 of Amended Complaint (Doc 188) , #232 MOTION to Dismiss Count 14 of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying #191 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #201 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to strike Plaintiff's "Objections" to the Court's Sanction Order #214. The Clerk of Court is further DIRECTED to strike Plaintiff's Notices of International Flight Rebooking #215, #218, #220, #227, and #238. The Court ADVISES Plaintiff that any future Notice of International Flight Rebooking, or anything similar, or any other violation of any of the Court's Orders will result in reference of the matter to Magistrate Judge Irick for a Report and Recommendation regarding appropriate sanctions. Finally, the Court CLARIFIES its Sanction Order and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to restrict Plaintiff's access to the pro se electronic portal. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/4/2022. (CPH) Modified on 3/7/2022 (GNB). (GNB).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER denying #252 Motion to Vacate, which the Court construes as an Objection under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a). The Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objection and AFFIRMS Magistrate Judge Irick's Order Staying the Federal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/4/2022. (CPH)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/4/2022. (GNB) ctp
March 2, 2022 Filing 252 MOTION to the District Judge to Vacate Portion of D.E. 248 Magistrate Judge's Order Staying Briefing by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 2, 2022 Filing 251 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #191 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
March 2, 2022 Filing 250 NOTICE of Change of Address to 3601 Cosmos Way, The Villages, FL 32163 by Lucas Wall (BD) Modified on 3/3/2022 to correct filed date (BD).
March 2, 2022 Filing 249 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pezzi, Stephen)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ENDORSED ORDER granting #231 Federal Defendant's Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing; granting #247 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Local Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Though both motions are opposed, the Court does not require a response from Plaintiff or any Defendant to rule and manage the progression of this case. The Federal Defendants' response to Plaintiff's #230 Motion for Summary Judgment is due 21 days after the Court enters a final order resolving the pending motion for preliminary injunction. Plaintiff's response to #232 LYNX's Motion to Dismiss and #233 GOAA's Motion to Dismiss is due 21 days after the date the Court enters a final order resolving the #246 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/1/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
March 1, 2022 Filing 247 MOTION to Stay Briefing on Local Defendants' #233 MOTION to Dismiss and #232 MOTION to Dismiss Until Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike by Lucas Wall. (BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 1, 2022 Filing 246 MOTION to Strike Local Defendants' #233 MOTION to Dismiss and #232 MOTION to Dismiss by Lucas Wall. (BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
March 1, 2022 Filing 245 SECOND RESPONSE to #235 Notice of Motions to Transfer filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #237 Motion for Reconsideration / Clarification. The Joint Motion for Clarification Regarding the Court's February 23, 2022 Order Concerning Case Management Report (Doc. 237) is GRANTED as set forth herein. In short, follow the district judge's order. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/28/2022. (RN)
February 28, 2022 Filing 243 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority: Middle District of Florida Enjoins Vaccine Mandate for Federal Contractors by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
February 28, 2022 Filing 242 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority: Middle District of Georgia Enjoins Air Force's Covid-19 Vaccine Mandate by Lucas Wall. (BD)
February 28, 2022 Filing 241 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority: District of Arizona Permanently Enjoins Vaccine Mandate for Federal Contractors by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
February 28, 2022 Filing 240 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority: District of Arizona Enjoins Vaccine Mandate for Federal Contractors by Lucas Wall. (BD)
February 28, 2022 Filing 237 Joint MOTION for Clarification re 236 Order Concerning Case Management Report by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Freidah, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 27, 2022 Filing 239 RESPONSE to Federal Defendants' #235 Notice of Motions to Transfer 3 Cases filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BD)
February 27, 2022 Filing 238 NOTICE of International Flight Rebooking for March 6 by Lucas Wall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD) Modified on 2/28/2022 to correct filed date (BD).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ENDORSED ORDER directing the parties to confer and file a Case Management Report within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file the Case Management Report will result in dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/23/2022. (GNB) ctp
February 23, 2022 Filing 235 NOTICE by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services of Motions to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fed. Defs.' Mot. to Transfer - Faris v. CDC (W.D. Ky.), #2 Exhibit 2 - Fed. Defs.' Mot. to Transfer - Seklecki v. CDC (D. Mass.), #3 Exhibit 3 - Fed. Defs.' Mot. to Transfer - Andreadakis v. CDC (E.D. Va.))(Freidah, Andrew)
February 22, 2022 Filing 234 ANSWER to #188 Amended Complaint by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services.(Pezzi, Stephen)
February 22, 2022 Filing 233 MOTION to Dismiss Count 13 of Amended Complaint (Doc 188) by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Culley, Sally) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 22, 2022 Filing 232 MOTION to Dismiss Count 14 of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 18, 2022 Filing 231 MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Freidah, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 16, 2022 Filing 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Defendants CDC & HHS on Counts 1-12 of the Amended Complaint by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 16, 2022 Filing 229 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (BD)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #224 Motion for Leave to File Document. The Motion to Exceed Page Limits (Doc. 224) is GRANTED in part to the extent that Plaintiff may file a single motion for summary judgment in this case of no more than 35 pages and is DENIED without prejudice in all other respects; denying #226 Motion for Extension of Time to File. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/15/2022. (RN)
February 12, 2022 Filing 227 NOTICE of International Flight Rebooking from Feb. 13 to Feb. 20 by Lucas Wall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
February 11, 2022 Filing 226 MOTION for Extension of Time for Federal Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint by Lucas Wall. (BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 11, 2022 Filing 225 NOTICE Supplementing Consultation Certification on Plaintiff's #224 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Both Sides' Upcoming Summary-Judgment Briefs by Lucas Wall (BD)
February 10, 2022 Filing 224 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Both Sides' Upcoming Summary Judgment Briefs by Lucas Wall. (BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
February 9, 2022 Filing 223 NOTICE of Related Action by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion to Vacate)(BD)
February 8, 2022 Filing 222 NOTICE Withdrawing #207 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by Lucas Wall (BD)
February 8, 2022 Filing 221 NOTICE Withdrawing #190 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Lucas Wall (BD)
February 8, 2022 Filing 220 NOTICE of International Flight Rebooking from Feb. 6 to Feb. 13 by Lucas Wall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
February 4, 2022 Filing 219 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority: Letter to White House from 29 Travel Industry Groups Urging Abolition of ITTR by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(BD)
January 30, 2022 Filing 218 NOTICE of International Flight Rebooking from Jan. 30 to Feb. 6 by Lucas Wall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
January 30, 2022 Filing 217 NOTICE of a Related Action by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (BD)
January 28, 2022 Filing 216 NOTICE of a Related Action by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (BD)
January 23, 2022 Filing 215 NOTICE of International Flight Rebooking from Jan. 23 to Jan. 30 & Urgent Need to Travel Due to Family Emergency by Lucas Wall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
January 23, 2022 Filing 214 OBJECTIONS to #211 Sanctions Order. (BD)
January 22, 2022 Filing 213 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority: Southern District of Texas Enjoins Vaccine Mandate for Federal Employees by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
January 19, 2022 Filing 212 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (BD)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SANCTIONS ORDER. The Court hereby REVOKES Plaintiff's electronic filing privileges. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/18/2022. (CPH)
January 18, 2022 Filing 210 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #199 Response in Opposition to Motion (Order in Wall v. TSA, No. 21A198, 595 U.S. --- (Jan. 18, 2022)) by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 14, 2022 Filing 209 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #199 Response in Opposition to Motion (Biden v. Missouri, 595 U.S. ___ (Jan. 13, 2022)) by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 13, 2022 Filing 208 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #191 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS Nat'l Federation of Independent Business v. Dept. of Labor by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
January 12, 2022 Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Combined Reply to #204 Response & #205 Response by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 10, 2022 Filing 206 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #191 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS Louisiana v. Becerra by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
January 10, 2022 Filing 205 RESPONSE in Opposition re #190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Culley, Sally)
January 10, 2022 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re #190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Judgment Denying Emergency Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Judgment dated 9-28-20)(Wood, David)
January 10, 2022 Filing 203 NOTICE of International Flight Rebooking from Jan. 10 to Jan. 23 by Lucas Wall re #191 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS (Wall, Lucas) Modified on 1/10/2022 (KNC).
January 7, 2022 Filing 202 NOTICE by Lucas Wall re #201 Second MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief to #199 Response Updated Conferral Certification (Wall, Lucas)
January 7, 2022 Filing 201 Second MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief to #199 Response by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
January 7, 2022 Filing 200 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #191 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS U.S. Navy SEALs 1-26 v. Biden by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
January 6, 2022 Filing 199 RESPONSE in Opposition re #191 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS filed by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Pezzi, Stephen)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ENDORSED ORDER granting #197 Joint Unopposed Motion to Toll Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint is tolled. Defendants shall either: (1) respond to the Amended Complaint 14 days after the date the Court denies the #190 Motion to Amend; or (2) respond to the Second Amended Complaint fourteen days after the date it is filed with leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/5/2022. (Irick, Daniel)
January 4, 2022 Filing 197 Joint Unopposed MOTION to Toll Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 1/5/2022 (TNP).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER STRIKING the "Time-Sensitive" designation from #191 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; DENYING without prejudice #192 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief; GRANTING #193 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. The Federal Defendants must respond to the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on or before January 6, 2022. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/4/2022. (CPH)
January 4, 2022 Reset deadline as to #191 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS. Response due by 1/6/2022 (TNP)
January 2, 2022 Filing 195 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #191 Time-Sensitive MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS Texas v. Becerra, No. 5:21-cv-300 (N.D. Tex. Dec. 31, 2021) by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 194 RESPONSE in Partial Opposition re #193 MOTION for Two Day Extension of Time to File Response as to #191 Time-Sensitive MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS filed by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 12/30/2021 (TNP).
December 29, 2021 Filing 193 MOTION for Two Day Extension of Time to File Response as to #191 Time-Sensitive MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS by Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Pezzi, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 12/30/2021 (TNP).
December 29, 2021 Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to #191 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 12/29/2021 (TNP).
December 28, 2021 Filing 191 Time-Sensitive MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CDC & HHS by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #1, #2 Text of Proposed Order #2, #3 Text of Proposed Order #3)(Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 12/29/2021 (TNP).
December 27, 2021 Filing 190 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 12/28/2021 (TNP).
December 27, 2021 Filing 189 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits 81-100 to Amended Complaint by Lucas Wall re #188 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81-100)(Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 12/27/2021 (TNP).
December 26, 2021 Filing 188 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority, Department of Health & Human Services, Greater Orlando Aviation Authority filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-40, #3 Exhibit 41-60, #4 Exhibit 61-80, #5 Exhibit 101-120, #6 Exhibit 121-134)(Wall, Lucas)
December 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying #49 Motion to Dismiss; denying #82 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #83 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #125 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #125 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting in part #155 Report and Recommendations. Counts 2, 10, 13, 16, and 20 of the Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in accordance with the parties' Notice of Agreement #126. Plaintiff's Objection to the Report and Recommendations #171 is OVERRULED. The Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before Monday, January 3, 2022, Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint consistent with the directives of this Order. Failure to timely file an Amended Complaint will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Defendants the Department of Homeland Security, the Transportation Security Administration, the Department of Transportation, and the President of the United States are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Defendants the Department of Homeland Security, the Transportation Security Administration, the Department of Transportation, and the President of the United States from the file. Counts 9, 11, 12, and 15 of the Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/18/2021. (CPH)
December 13, 2021 Filing 186 NOTICE of International Flight Rebooking From Dec. 10 to Dec. 20 by Lucas Wall re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other), #171 Objection (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (TNP).
December 7, 2021 Filing 185 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other), #171 Objection Georgia v. Biden (S.D. Ga.) by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
December 7, 2021 Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment, #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #155 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Depa Reply Re: International Traveler Testing Requirement filed by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ENDORSED ORDER granting #182 Motion to File Reply Brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief on or before Friday, December 10, 2021, limited to addressing the arguments related to the ITTR raised for the first time in the Federal Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Objections to the Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's reply may not exceed five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/6/2021. (CPH) Modified on 12/6/2021 (GNB).
December 6, 2021 Set deadlines as to #172 RESPONSE to objections to #155 Report and Recommendations. Reply Brief due by 12/10/2021. (TNP)
December 3, 2021 Filing 182 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Reply Brief re #172 Response & #181 Notice by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
December 3, 2021 Filing 181 NOTICE by Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration of Issuance of Amended Global Testing Order (Dec. 2, 2021) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Amended Global Testing Order (Dec. 2, 2021), #2 Ex. 2 - Passenger Attestation Form)(Pezzi, Stephen)
December 2, 2021 Filing 180 RESPONSE to objections to #155 Report and Recommendations filed by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Culley, Sally)
December 2, 2021 Filing 179 RESPONSE to objections to #155 Report and Recommendations filed by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David)
December 2, 2021 Filing 178 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other), #171 Objection State of Missouri v. Biden by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
December 2, 2021 Filing 177 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other), #171 Objection State of Louisiana v. Becerra by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
December 2, 2021 Filing 176 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other), #171 Objection Eastern District of Kentucky Enjoins Defendant Biden's Vaccine Mandate for Federal Contractors by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
December 2, 2021 Filing 175 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other), #171 Objection BST Holdings v. Occupational Health & Safety Administration by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
December 2, 2021 Filing 174 NOTICE by Lucas Wall re #173 Notice (Other) Attachment to Doc. 173 (United Ticket) (Wall, Lucas)
December 2, 2021 Filing 173 NOTICE by Lucas Wall re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #155 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Depa, #171 Objection International Flight Rebooking from Dec. 1 to Dec. 10 (Wall, Lucas)
December 1, 2021 Filing 172 RESPONSE to objections to #155 Report and Recommendations filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen)
November 18, 2021 Filing 171 OBJECTION re #155 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Depa . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Request for Oral Argument)(Wall, Lucas)
November 5, 2021 Set deadline: Objections to R&R due by 11/19/2021 (TNP)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ENDORSED ORDER granting #169 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit & Extend Time. Plaintiff is granted an additional 10 pages to object to the #155 report and recommendation, and the deadline for that objection is 11/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 11/5/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
November 5, 2021 Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages for Second Objections to R&R, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Objections to R&R by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #163 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's Objections #162 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may refile his Objections in accordance with this Order on or before November 12, 2021. If Plaintiff fails to timely refile his Objections, then the Court will deem Magistrate Judge Irick's Report unopposed. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/4/2021. (CPH)
November 4, 2021 Filing 167 RESPONSE to objections to #155 Report and Recommendations filed by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Culley, Sally)
November 4, 2021 Filing 166 RESPONSE to objections to #155 Report and Recommendations filed by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David)
November 4, 2021 Filing 165 RESPONSE to objections to #155 Report and Recommendations filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen)
November 1, 2021 Filing 164 RESPONSE in Opposition re #163 MOTION to Strike #162 Objection filed by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
October 26, 2021 Filing 163 MOTION to Strike #162 Objection by Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
October 21, 2021 Filing 162 OBJECTION re #155 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lucas Wall . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 10/22/2021 (TNP).
October 21, 2021 Filing 161 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Review)(Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 10/22/2021 (TNP).
October 20, 2021 Filing 160 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other) Alabama Ass'n of Realtors v. HHS, U.S. Supreme Court No. 21A23 (Aug. 26, 2021) by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying #144 Motion to Vacate. The Court AFFIRMS Magistrate Judge Irick's Order striking the Notice of Supplemental Authority 141 and OVERRULES Plaintiff's objection. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/19/2021. (CPH)
October 14, 2021 Filing 158 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Government Counsel by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Smart, Adam) Modified text on 10/15/2021 (TNP).
October 13, 2021 Filing 157 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Transfer Under Local Rule 1.07(a)(2)(B) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Gov't's Mot. to Transfer in Health Freedom Defense Fund, Inc. v. Biden (M.D. Fla.))(Pezzi, Stephen) Modified on 10/14/2021 (KNC).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Protective Order; granting #153 Motion to Stay Discovery. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/7/2021. (RN)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Transportation, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Joseph Biden, #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT filed by Lucas Wall, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Count 17 of Complaint (Doc. 1) filed by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority, #82 MOTION to Dismiss Count 18 of 1 Complaint by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Dismiss Count 17 by Defendant Greater Orlando Aviation Authority (GOAA) (Doc. 49) should be GRANTED such that Count 17 be dismissed with prejudice; The Motion to Dismiss Count 18 by Defendant Central Florida Regional transportation Authority (LYNX) (Doc. 82) should be GRANTED such that Count 18 be dismissed with prejudice; The Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Federal Defendants on Counts 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 by Plaintiff (Doc. 83) be DENIED as moot if the Complaint is dismissed as recommended herein; and The Motion to Dismiss and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by the Federal Defendants (Doc. 125) be GRANTED in part to the extent that any claims against DHS, TSA, and DOT be dismissed without leave to replead in this Court; GRANTED in part to the extent that any claims against the President of the United States, GOAA, and LYNX be dismissed with prejudice; DENIED as moot to the extent that it requests summary judgment or any other relief; Plaintiff be DIRECTED to file an amended complaint consistent with the Court's order on this Report and Recommendation within a set number of days after that order is issued. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 10/7/2021. (RN) Modified on 10/7/2021 (RN).
September 29, 2021 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority and Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority filed by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 153 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority and Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - September 6, 2021 Email from Plaintiff to GOAA's Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - September 6, 2021 Email from Plaintiff to Lynx's Counsel)(Culley, Sally) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 28, 2021 Filing 152 NOTICE by Lucas Wall re #144 MOTION to Vacate 141 Order to strike #140 Notice of Supplemental Authority -- Requesting Immediate Ruling on Unopposed Motion to Vacate (Pending One Month) (Wall, Lucas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION for Protective Order (Short Form) filed by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
September 22, 2021 Filing 150 MOTION for Protective Order (Short Form) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Request 1 (DOT), #2 Request 2 (TSA and NSC), #3 Request 3 (TSA), #4 Request 4 (FAA), #5 Request 5 (TSA))(Pezzi, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 21, 2021 Filing 149 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other) Huisha-Huisha v. Mayorkas, No. 21-100 (D.D.C. Sept. 16, 2021) by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
September 17, 2021 Filing 148 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Sept. 17, 2021 Notice of a Related Action in Health Freedom v. Biden)(Pezzi, Stephen)
September 17, 2021 Filing 147 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM in support re #82 Motion to Dismiss filed by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David) Modified text on 9/3/2021 (MEJ).
September 1, 2021 Filing 145 NOTICE of Extension of TSA Security Directives by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - SD 1542-21-01B (Airport Operators), #2 Ex. 2 - SD 1544-21-02B (Aircraft Operators), #3 Ex. 3 - SD 1582-84-21-01B (Surface Operators), #4 Ex. 4 - EA 1546-21-01B (Foreign Air Carriers), #5 Ex. 5 - TSA Administrator Action Memorandum)(Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (MEJ).
August 28, 2021 Filing 144 MOTION to Vacate 141 Order to strike #140 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 28, 2021 Filing 143 RESPONSE re #142 Order directing compliance filed by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE. Plaintiff is hereby DIRECTED to file a written response within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why this case should not be dismissed, pursuant to Local Rule 3.10, for lack of prosecution due to the non-filing of a Case Management Report within the time prescribed by Local Rule 3.02(b). Failure to respond to this Order may result in a dismissal of this action or the imposition of other appropriate sanctions without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/27/2021. (GNB) ctp
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ENDORSED ORDER to strike #140 Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. If a party deems it appropriate to alert the Court to a new legal authority by filing a notice of supplemental authority, it may do so by filing only the citation to the new legal authority. Plaintiff has filed a number of notices that go beyond such a citation and--in conjunction with each other and the filing they purport to supplement--constitute violations of the Court's local rules concerning page limitations. See, e.g., Docs. 99, 107, 109, 108, 140. Any further notices that contain such commentary will be stricken and the filer may be subject to sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/27/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 27, 2021 Filing 140 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT, #127 Notice (Other) Alabama Ass'n of Realtors v. HHS by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ENDORSED ORDER granting #138 Defendant Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/26/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 26, 2021 Filing 138 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of its Dispositive Motion to Dismiss by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #133 Motion for Leave to File a Combined 25-Page Reply Brief. On or Before September 30, 2021. On or before 9/17/2021, the Federal Defendants may file a 14-page combined reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/25/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 24, 2021 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION for Leave to File Combined 25-Page Reply Brief in Support of Federal Defendants' Motions on or Before September 30, 2021 filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 8/25/2021 (MEJ).
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff Lucas Wall to file an expedited response to the #133 MOTION for Leave to File Combined 25-Page Reply Brief in Support of Federal Defendants' Motions. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion by 8/27/2021; if no response if filed by that date, the Court will deem the Motion unopposed. The deadlines sought to be extended by the Motion are temporarily stayed pending resolution of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/23/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ENDORSED ORDER denying #132 Defendant Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority's Motion to Adopt Legal Arguments Asserted in D.E. 129. The Court will not permit the parties to "adopt" any argument made in any prior filing. If a party seeks to file a reply (or assert an argument), it must follow the local rules in doing so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/23/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 20, 2021 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to File Combined 25-Page Reply Brief in Support of Federal Defendants' Motions on or Before September 30, 2021 by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified event on 8/23/2021 (MEJ).
August 20, 2021 Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to Adopt Legal Arguments Asserted in D.E. #129 by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified event on 8/20/2021 (MEJ).
August 19, 2021 Filing 131 NOTICE of compliance re #30 Order by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority (Culley, Sally)
August 18, 2021 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION to Dismiss Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment and REPLY to Opposition re [127-1] Amended Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Federal Defendants on Counts 1, 4-6, 9, 12, 19, & 22-23 of the Complaint filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-20, #3 Exhibit 21-30, #4 Exhibit 31-40, #5 Exhibit 41-50, #6 Exhibit 51-60, #7 Exhibit 61-70, #8 Exhibit 71-80, #9 Exhibit 81-90, #10 Exhibit 91-100, #11 Exhibit 101-110, #12 Exhibit 111-120, #13 Exhibit 121-130, #14 Exhibit 131-140, #15 Exhibit 141-150, #16 Exhibit 151-160, #17 Exhibit 161-170, #18 Exhibit 171-180, #19 Exhibit 181-186, #20 Exhibit 187-215 (Declarations), #21 Exhibit 216-218, #22 Hearing Request)(Wall, Lucas) Modified on 8/19/2021 (MEJ).
August 18, 2021 Filing 129 REPLY re #100 Response in Opposition to Motion by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Culley, Sally)
August 13, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Reply to #100 Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 8/19/2021. (MEJ)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ENDORSED ORDER granting #106 Motion for Leave to File Reply. On or before 8/19/2021, Defendant GOAA may file a seven-page reply to Plaintiff's #100 response to Defendant GOAA's #49 Motion to Dismiss Count 17. See Local Rule 3.01(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/12/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 127 NOTICE of Minor Amendment to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Removing References to Counts 2, 10, & 20 of the Complaint by Lucas Wall re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Federal Defendants on Counts 1, 4-6, 9, 12, 19, & 22-23 of the Complaint)(Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 126 Joint NOTICE of Agreement to Dismiss Counts 2, 10, 13, 16, & 20 of the Complaint by Lucas Wall (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss , Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , and OPPOSITION to #83 Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - CDC - Federal Transportation Mask Order, #2 Ex. 2 - DHS - Decl. of Nat'l Emergency, #3 Ex. 3 - TSA - SD 1542-21-01A (Airport Operators), #4 Ex. 4 - TSA - SD 1544-21-02A (Aircraft Operators), #5 Ex. 5 - TSA - SD 1582(84)-21-01A (Surface Operators), #6 Ex. 6 - TSA - EA 1546-21-01 (Foreign Air Carriers), #7 Ex. 7 - CDC - UK Testing Order, #8 Ex. 8 - CDC - Int'l Traveler Testing Order 1, #9 Ex. 9 - CDC - Int'l Traveler Testing Order 2, #10 Ex. 10 - Order Requiring Masks in Middle District of Florida Courthouses, #11 Ex. 11 - TSA - Ratification of Security Directives)(Pezzi, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified to link motion on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 124 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (TSA Security Directives, Part 2 of 2) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 123 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (TSA Security Directives, Part 1 of 2) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 122 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Int'l Traveler Testing Order, CDC_ITTO, Part 4 of 4) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 121 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Int'l Traveler Testing Order, CDC_ITTO, Part 3 of 4) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 120 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Int'l Traveler Testing Order, CDC_ITTO, Part 2 of 4) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 119 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Int'l Traveler Testing Order, CDC_ITTO, Part 1 of 4) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 118 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Transportation Mask Order, CDC_TMO, Part 5 of 5) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 117 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Transportation Mask Order, CDC_TMO, Part 4 of 5) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Transportation Mask Order, CDC_TMO, Part 3 of 5) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 115 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Transportation Mask Order, CDC_TMO, Part 2 of 5) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 114 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Record (Transportation Mask Order, CDC_TMO, Part 1 of 5) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 113 NOTICE of Filing of Certified Administrative Records by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - CDC - Certification of AR for Transportation Mask Order, #2 Ex. 2 - CDC - Index to AR for Transportation Mask Order, #3 Ex. 3 - CDC - Certification of AR for Int'l Traveler Testing Order, #4 Ex. 4 - CDC - Index to AR for Int'l Traveler Testing Order, #5 Ex. 5 - TSA - Certified Index of AR for TSA Security Directives)(Pezzi, Stephen) Modified on 8/10/2021 (MEJ).
August 9, 2021 Filing 112 SUPPLEMENT re #82 MOTION to Dismiss Count 18 of #1 Complaint by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David)
August 6, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE - Updated Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Count 17 of Complaint (Doc. 1) (Culley, Sally) Modified text on 8/9/2021 (MEJ).
August 1, 2021 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of #49 Motion to Dismiss Count 17 of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
August 1, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT Brown v. HHS (11th Cir. July 14, 2021) by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
August 1, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT Tiger Lily v. HUD (6th Cir. July 23, 2021) by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
July 31, 2021 Filing 107 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #101 Response in Opposition to Motion, #100 Response in Opposition to Motion Florida Executive Order 21-175 by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
July 29, 2021 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of #49 Motion to Dismiss Count 17 of Plaintiff's Complaint by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Delaney, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified event on 7/29/2021 (MEJ).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ENDORSED ORDER granting #103 Motion to File Consolidated Brief; granting #104 Motion to File Consolidated Brief. The parties may filed the consolidated briefs described in their Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/28/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
July 27, 2021 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Combined 47-Page Brief by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 7/28/2021 (MEJ).
July 27, 2021 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Combined 70-Page Brief Moving to Dismiss, Cross-Moving for Summary Judgment, and Opposing Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 7/28/2021 (MEJ).
July 26, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE of Constitutional Question Regarding Florida Statute 768.38(3)(b) by Lucas Wall re #101 Response in Opposition to Motion, #100 Response in Opposition to Motion (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 7/27/2021 (MEJ).
July 26, 2021 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Dismiss Count 18 of #1 Complaint filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Hearing Request)(Wall, Lucas)
July 26, 2021 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Count 17 of Complaint (Doc. 1) filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Hearing Request)(Wall, Lucas)
July 24, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT State of Florida v. Becerra (11th Cir. July 23, 2021) by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying #61 Motion to Disqualify Judge / Juror. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/22/2021. (DS)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ENDORSED ORDER granting #96 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the #83 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Federal Defendants' response is due by 8/9/2021. The Motion was granted based upon the cause stated therein, no party may incorporate prior arguments by reference. See Local Rule 3.01(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/20/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
July 20, 2021 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 20, 2021 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #30 Order by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David)
July 20, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. Related case(s): Yes (Wood, David)
July 19, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE of a related action Health Freedom Defense Fund v. Biden (M.D. Fla.) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Wall, Lucas)
July 14, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE of Updated Certificate of Consultation by Lucas Wall re #61 MOTION to Disqualify Judge (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (MEJ).
July 14, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE of Supreme Court Decision by Lucas Wall re #89 Notice (Other) (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (MEJ).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying #84 Plaintiff's Time Sensitive Motion to Expedite Summary Judgment Briefing and Hearing. To the extent that the Federal Defendants have buried a request for an extension of time to file a response to the Motion for Summary Judgment within their response to Plaintiff's Motion, the request is DENIED. If a party seeks relief, that party must file a motion in accordance with the Local Rules of this Court including Local Rules 3.01(a) and 3.01(g). See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/14/2021. (RN)
July 12, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE of Supreme Court Docketing by Lucas Wall (Attachments: #1 Emergency Application for Writ of Injunction, #2 Appendix)(Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 7/13/2021 (TNP).
July 10, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE of a related action Florida Association of Realtors v. Centers for Disease Control & Prevention per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Wall, Lucas)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part #85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply to the extent that Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the Motions to Dismiss is extended to July 27, 2021 and DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/9/2021. (DS)
July 9, 2021 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 Time-Sensitive MOTION to Expedite Summary Judgment Briefing and Hearing filed by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen) Modified text on 7/9/2021 (MEJ).
July 9, 2021 Filing 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #82 MOTION to Dismiss Count 18 of #1 Complaint, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Count 17 of Complaint (Doc. 1) (TIME-SENSITIVE) by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 9, 2021 Filing 84 Time-Sensitive MOTION to Expedite Summary Judgment Briefing and Hearing by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 7/9/2021 (MEJ).
July 9, 2021 Set/reset deadlines as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss Count 17 of Complaint (Doc. 1) , #82 MOTION to Dismiss Count 18 of #1 Complaint. Responses due by 7/27/2021 (MEJ)
July 8, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-2, 4-6, 9-10, 12, 19-20, & 22-23 OF THE COMPLAINT by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Request for Oral Argument)(Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 6, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss Count 18 of #1 Complaint by Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wood, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 7/7/2021 (MEJ).
July 6, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Additional Appearance by Monica Marie McNulty Kovecses on behalf of Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority (McNulty Kovecses, Monica)
July 6, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by David Storrs Wood on behalf of Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority (Wood, David)
July 1, 2021 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #30 Order by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Hill, Suzanne)
July 1, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. Related case(s): Yes (Hill, Suzanne)
June 30, 2021 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #30 Order by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 30, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. Related case(s): Yes (Smart, Adam)
June 30, 2021 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #30 Order by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Smart, Adam)
June 30, 2021 Filing 74 MANDATE of USCA as to #58 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lucas Wall. Issued as Mandate: 6/30/2021. USCA number: 21-12179. DISMISSED. (TNP)
June 29, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 6/30/2021 (MEJ).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #66 Emergency Motion for District Judge to reconsider Order Denying Temporary Restraining Order on Counts 1-12 & 14-15 of the Complaint, due to the filing of #69 Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawing Pending Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/29/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #65 Emergency Motion for Certificate of Appealability, due to the filing of #68 Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawing Pending Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/29/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
June 29, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Lucas Wall re #66 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lucas Wall (Wall, Lucas)
June 29, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Lucas Wall re #65 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability re: #28 Order denying temporary restraining order filed by Lucas Wall (Wall, Lucas)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #56 Motion to Vacate. Plaintiff is advised that the next demonstration of abuse of his electronic filing privileges will result in the immediate revocation of those privileges. Plaintiff is further advised that the next unwarranted designation of a filing as an "emergency" in violation of the Local Rules will result in this Court holding him in civil contempt. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/29/2021. (CPH)
June 28, 2021 Filing 70 MANDATE of USCA as to Emergency Petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 1292(b) filed by Petitioner Lucas Wall. Issued as Mandate: 6/28/2021. USCA number: 21-90017. DENIED. (TNP)
June 28, 2021 Filing 66 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #28 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 28, 2021 Filing 65 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability re: #28 Order denying temporary restraining order by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11th Circuit Order)(Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 6/28/2021 (MEJ).
June 27, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #56 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #55 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionOrder on Motion to Strike Declarations of 4 Airline Passengers by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 26, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #56 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #55 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionOrder on Motion to Strike Frontier & Spirit Airlines Oppose Mask Mandate by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 26, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #56 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #55 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionOrder on Motion to Strike 5 Declarations of Airline Passengers by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Magistrate Judge Daniel Irick by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 25, 2021 Filing 60 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #58 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (MEJ)
June 24, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Emergency Motion for PI or TRO Filed with 11th Circuit by Lucas Wall re #58 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 6/25/2021 (MEJ).
June 24, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 47 Order on Motion for Reconsideration / Clarification, #55 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionOrder on Motion to Strike, #31 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations, #28 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Timestamp Regarding Filing of Doc. 56 by Lucas Wall re #56 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #55 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Strike (Wall, Lucas) Modified text on 6/25/2021 (MEJ).
June 22, 2021 Filing 56 Emergency MOTION to Vacate #55 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionOrder on Motion to Strike by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wall, Lucas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER striking #33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; striking #36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part #48 Motion to Strike. It is ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion (Doc. 48) is GRANTED in part to the extent that Plaintiff's Motions (Docs. 33, 36) are hereby STRICKEN. Plaintiff may refile his request for a preliminary injunction in a single motion of no more than 25 pages that complies with the Local Rules and the Court's Orders. If Plaintiff does so, Defendants are directed to file a response within THIRTY DAYS of the filing of the motion for preliminary injunction. The remainder of Defendants' Motion (Doc. 48) is DENIED without prejudice. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/22/2021. (RN)
June 22, 2021 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #48 Motion to Strike filed by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-12 & 14-15 OF THE COMPLAINT Delta Air Lines & Spirit Airlines tickets by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-12 & 14-15 OF THE COMPLAINT Declarations of 2 Passengers & 1 Former Flight Attendant by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-12 & 14-15 OF THE COMPLAINT Canceled Allegiant Airlines ticket by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 22, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-12 & 14-15 OF THE COMPLAINT Denial Letter from Southwest Airlines by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 21, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Count 17 of Complaint (Doc. 1) by Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Culley, Sally)
June 21, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION to Strike #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-12 & 14-15 OF THE COMPLAINT, #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 19-23 OF THE COMPLAINT (Federal Defendants' Motion to Strike and to Set Combined Briefing Deadline) by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Pezzi, Stephen)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER striking #46 Motion for Reconsideration / Clarification. The administration of the court is not Plaintiff's concern. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/21/2021. (CPH)
June 20, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re #31 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations and Objection to Referral by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 20, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 19-23 OF THE COMPLAINT State of Florida v. Becerra by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 20, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-12 & 14-15 OF THE COMPLAINT State of Florida v. Becerra by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 20, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of a related action Green v. Alachua County (Fla. 1st D. Ct. App.) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Wall, Lucas)
June 20, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of a related action State of Florida v. Becerra (M.D. Fla.) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Wall, Lucas)
June 20, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of a related action County of Butler v. Governor of Pennsylvania (3rd Cir.) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Wall, Lucas)
June 19, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of a related action 6 CDC Eviction Moratorium Cases per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Wall, Lucas)
June 19, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of a related action Corbett v. TSA (D.C. Cir) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (Wall, Lucas)
June 18, 2021 Filing 38 RETURN of service executed on June 14, 2021 by Lucas Wall as to Greater Orlando Aviation Authority. (Wall, Lucas)
June 18, 2021 Filing 37 RETURN of service executed on June 14, 2021 by Lucas Wall as to Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority. (Wall, Lucas)
June 18, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 19-23 OF THE COMPLAINT by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Hearing Request)(Wall, Lucas)
June 18, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-12 & 14-15 OF THE COMPLAINT Roll Call article by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
June 17, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS ON COUNTS 1-12 & 14-15 OF THE COMPLAINT by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 -- State Mask Mandates, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Hearing Request)(Wall, Lucas)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion to Combine Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for TRO, given the Court's #28 Order denying the Motion for TRO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/17/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/17/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed Modified on 6/17/2021 (GNB).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/17/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed Modified on 6/17/2021 (GNB).
June 16, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Delaney on behalf of Greater Orlando Aviation Authority (Delaney, Patrick)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/15/2021. (CPH)
June 15, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Rogers Culley on behalf of Greater Orlando Aviation Authority (Culley, Sally)
June 15, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Barto Hill on behalf of Greater Orlando Aviation Authority (Hill, Suzanne)
June 15, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jay Gerber on behalf of Greater Orlando Aviation Authority (Gerber, Daniel)
June 15, 2021 Filing 24 PROOF of service via certified mail on June 14,2021 for United States Attorney General by Lucas Wall (DS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF of service via certified mail on June 10,2021 for U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Florida by Lucas Wall (DS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 22 RETURN of service executed via certified mail on June 14,2021 by Lucas Wall as to Transportation Security Administration. (DS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 21 RETURN of service executed via certified mail on June 14,2021 by Lucas Wall as to Department of Health & Human Services. (DS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed via certified mail on June 14,2021 by Lucas Wall as to Department of Transportation. (DS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed via certified mail on June 14,2021 by Lucas Wall as to Department of Homeland Security. (DS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed via certified mail on June 14,2021 by Lucas Wall as to Centers For Disease Control & Prevention. (DS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed via certified mail on June 14,2021 by Lucas Wall as to Joseph Biden. (DS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): No (DS)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Pezzi on behalf of Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration (Pezzi, Stephen)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Electronically; noting #13 Notice of Federal Defendants' Consent to Plaintiff's Motion. Plaintiff is granted permission to receive notice and file electronically via CM/ECF in this case, subject to Plaintiff's strict compliance with the rules and orders of this Court; any failure by Plaintiff to comply with those rules and orders may result in immediate revocation of this permission. Plaintiff is directed to register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/14/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
June 13, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for consent to leave to file electronically by Lucas Wall. (DS)
June 12, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in PARTIAL Opposition re #11 MOTION TO COMBINE BRIEFING THE FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOC. 8) AND HIS FORTHCOMING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(DS)
June 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Combine Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 8) and Forthcoming Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Joseph Biden, Centers For Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Transportation, Transportation Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C)(Smart, Adam) Modified text on 6/14/2021 (MEJ).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER denying #9 Motion to File Excess Pages and to File a Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/11/2021. (CPH)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 Time Sensitive MOTION to File Excess Pages and Reply Brief by Lucas Wall. (DS) Modified text on 6/11/2021 (MEJ).
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all Federal Defendants on counts 1-12 & 14-15 of the complaint by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration if Lucas Wall, #2 Exhibit 2- Washington Post Article)(DS) Modified text on 6/11/2021 (MEJ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2021: #3 Exhibit Proposed Order) (DS).
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MEJ)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Leave to Permit Passage into the Courthouse of Electronic Devices. No hearings are set in this case, nor has good cause been stated for Plaintiff to bring electronic devices into the courthouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/9/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to permit electronic devices in the courthouse by Lucas Wall. (DS)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER denying #2 Emergency Motion for Leave to File Electronically. Plaintiff is cautioned against the unwarranted designation of a motion as an emergency. See Local Rule 3.01(e) ("The unwarranted designation of a motion as an emergency can result in a sanction.") Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/8/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fee $ $402, receipt number ORL098574 filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - 20, #4 Exhibit 21 - 40, #5 Exhibit 41 - 60, #6 Exhibit 61 - 80, #7 Exhibit 81 - 100, #8 Exhibit 101 - 120, #9 Exhibit 121 - 140, #10 Exhibit 141 - 160, #11 Exhibit 161 - 180, #12 Exhibit 181 - 200, #13 Exhibit 201 - 210)(ALL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. Centers For Disease Control & Prevention et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Biden
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers For Disease Control & Prevention
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Represented By: Andrew Freidah
Represented By: Marcia Kay Sowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Represented By: Andrew Freidah
Represented By: Marcia Kay Sowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Security Administration
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Represented By: Andrew Freidah
Represented By: Marcia Kay Sowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Represented By: Andrew Freidah
Represented By: Marcia Kay Sowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Represented By: Andrew Freidah
Represented By: Marcia Kay Sowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Florida Regional Transportation Authority
Represented By: David Storrs Wood
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty Kovecses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Orlando Aviation Authority
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Patrick M. Delaney
Represented By: Sally Rogers Culley
Represented By: Suzanne Barto Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Represented By: Andrew Freidah
Represented By: Marcia Kay Sowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?