Wall v. Southwest Airlines et al
Plaintiff: Lucas Wall
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Spirit Airlines, Delta Air Lines, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Alaska Airlines and Allegiant Air
Case Number: 6:2021cv01008
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
2 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 8/23/2021, Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/23/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
July 23, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 22, 2021 by Lucas Wall as to Frontier Airlines. (Wall, Lucas)
July 23, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 22, 2021 by Lucas Wall as to Allegiant Air. (Wall, Lucas)
July 22, 2021 Filing 37 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply, #1 Complaint by Delta Air Lines. (Baumgarten, Maurice)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Disqualify Judge. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/22/2021. (RN)
July 21, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 21, 2021 by Lucas Wall as to Alaska Airlines. (Wall, Lucas)
July 21, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE by Lucas Wall re #22 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Magistrate Judge Daniel Irick Updated Certificate of Consultation (Wall, Lucas)
July 21, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 21, 2021 by Lucas Wall as to Southwest Airlines. (Wall, Lucas)
July 21, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 21, 2021 by Lucas Wall as to JetBlue Airways. (Wall, Lucas)
July 21, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER of service returned executed on July 21, 2021 by Lucas Wall as to Spirit Airlines. (Wall, Lucas)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. M. Roy Goldberg is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/20/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
July 15, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for M. Roy Goldberg to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18481530 for $150 by Delta Air Lines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Attorney Certification)(Baumgarten, Maurice) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 7/30/2021, Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/13/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by JetBlue Airways. Related case(s): Yes (Gilbert, Suzanne)
July 12, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Initial Order by JetBlue Airways. (Gilbert, Suzanne) Modified on 7/13/2021 (RDO).
July 9, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Order by Delta Air Lines. (Baumgarten, Maurice)
July 9, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Delta Air Lines. (Baumgarten, Maurice)
July 1, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Order by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Magistrate Judge Daniel Irick by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wall, Lucas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 21 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-01008-PGB-DCI. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
June 23, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to Spirit Airlines on June 22, 2021 by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to JetBlue Airways on June 22, 2021 by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to Frontier Airlines on June 22, 2021 by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to Allegiant Air on June 22, 2021 by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to Alaska Airlines on June 22, 2021 by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to Southwest Airlines on June 22, 2021 by Lucas Wall. (Wall, Lucas)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER In the interests of justice, the undersigned transfers this case to United States Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick, with his permission. The Standing Discovery Order, Doc. No. 4, is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/22/2021. (MB)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 06/21/2021 by Lucas Wall as to Delta Air Lines. (Wall, Lucas) Modified on 6/22/2021 (RDO).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Electronically. The Clerk shall permit Plaintiff to register for and use CM/ECF only for the prosecution of this case. Plaintiff shall have CM/ECF privileges provided he: (1) Complies with the Middle District of Florida Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, which can be found at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/sites/flmd/files/documents/flmd-administrative-procedures-for-electronic-filing.pdf; (2) Follows the Clerk's instructions with respect to registering and using the CM/ECF system; and (3) Plaintiff does not abuse the privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/17/2021. (MB)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/17/2021. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/17/2021. (GNB) copies mailed/e-mailed
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 Entered in Error.
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/16/2021. (JRR) Modified on 6/16/2021 (GNB).
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JetBlue Airways. (Gilbert, Suzanne)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against all defendants as to count 1 of the complaint by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration 1)(DS)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (VACATED PER #14 ORDER) ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/15/2021. (MB) Modified on 6/23/2021 (RDO).
June 15, 2021 FEES paid by Lucas Wall (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ORL098793) (TNP)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(TNP)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lucas Wall. Related case(s): Yes (TNP)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alaska Airlines, Allegiant Air, Delta Air Lines, Frontier Airlines, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Spirit Airlines filed by Lucas Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-20, #2 Exhibits 21-40, #3 Exhibits 41-60, #4 Exhibits 61-80, #5 Exhibits 81-94, #6 Exhibits 96-110, #7 Exhibits 111-133, #8 Proposed Summons - Southwest Airlines, #9 Proposed Summons - Alaska Airlines, #10 Proposed Summons - Allegiant Air, #11 Proposed Summons - Delta Air Lines, #12 Proposed Summons - Frontier Airlines, #13 Proposed Summons - JetBlue Airways, #14 Proposed Summons - Spirit Airlines, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(TNP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. Southwest Airlines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines
Represented By: Maurice Jay Baumgarten
Represented By: Milton Roy Goldberg
Represented By: Roberto A. Torricella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways
Represented By: Suzanne E. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Air
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?