AC Ventures of Florida, LLC v. RBC Network Services Corp.
Plaintiff: AC VENTURES OF FLORIDA, LLC
Defendant: RBC NETWORK SERVICES CORP.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01120
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Wendy W Berger
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing case re #21 Plaintiff's Notice of voluntary dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/26/2021. (RMF)ctp
August 25, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by AC Ventures of Florida, LLC (Larkin, David)
August 16, 2021 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Johnson, Daniel)
August 13, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by AC Ventures of Florida, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Larkin, David) Modified on 8/16/2021 (KNC).
August 13, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AC Ventures of Florida, LLC. (Larkin, David)
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Unopposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claim for Attorney's Fees by RBC Network Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Daniel) Modified on 8/6/2021 (KNC).
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Unopposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claim for Attorney's Fees by RBC Network Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Daniel) Modified on 8/6/2021 (KNC).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 8/5/2021, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint. No further extension should be sought based on the cause stated in the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/22/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Time Sensitive Unopposed Motion of Defendant RBC Network Services Corp. For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum of Law In Support by RBC Network Services Corp.. (Johnson, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Steven J. Pacini is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/20/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Steven J. Pacini to appear pro hac vice and Memorandum of Law In Support, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18474980 for $150 by RBC Network Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Special Admission Attorney Certificate - Steven J Pacini)(Johnson, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified on 7/15/2021 (rearranged text) (KNC).
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 7/12/2021. (RMF)ctp
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Action; Related Cases: Yes by RBC Network Services Corp. (Johnson, Daniel) Modified on 7/9/2021 (KNC).
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement of Defendant RBC Network Services Corp. by RBC Network Services Corp.. (Johnson, Daniel)
July 8, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for RBC Network Services Corp.. Answer due by 7/26/2021. (RDO)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 7/26/2021, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 7/7/2021. (Irick, Daniel)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Steven J. Pacini Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC) ctp
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by RBC NETWORK SERVICES CORP. re #1 Notice of Removal (Johnson, Daniel) Modified on 7/7/2021 (KNC).
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-1120-WWB-DCI. (SJB)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal of Defendant RBC Network Services Corp. for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by RBC NETWORK SERVICES CORP.. (Johnson, Daniel)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from EIGHTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, case number 05-2021-CA-031150 filed in State Court on June 2, 2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18442334 filed by RBC NETWORK SERVICES CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AC Ventures of Florida, LLC v. RBC Network Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AC VENTURES OF FLORIDA, LLC
Represented By: David Grayman Larkin
Represented By: Jesse L. Kabaservice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC NETWORK SERVICES CORP.
Represented By: Daniel C. Johnson
Represented By: Steven J. Pacini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?