Llamas et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al
Plaintiff: Noelle Llamas and Ken Klippenstein
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Marshals Service and U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 6:2021cv01169
Filed: July 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 20 Remark: Doc. #19 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/14/2021. (LLM)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Order directing compliance by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Marshals Service. (Smart, Adam)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing compliance to #12 Initial Order. On or before September 24, 2021, the Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/10/2021. (BIA)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. All Defendants' answer or response due by 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/16/2021. (MKH)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/18/21 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Smart, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. Modified text on 8/16/2021 (LDJ).
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2021. (LLM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Order pdf by Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas identifying Corporate Parent The Intercept for Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas. Related case(s): No (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/23/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LDJ)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-1169-RBD-LRH. (SJB)
July 18, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18487220) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bourdon, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Llamas et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelle Llamas
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Bourdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Klippenstein
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Bourdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marshals Service
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Adam R Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?