Garcia v. Covidien LP et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Garcia
Defendant: Covidien LP and Medtronic, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01208
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Embry J Kidd
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing the parties to confer and advise the Court on the selection of a mediator within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/23/2021. (GNB) ctp
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2022 Discovery due by 9/1/2022 Dispositive motions due by 10/3/2022 Pretrial statement due by 1/17/2023 All other motions due by 1/23/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/5/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/1/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Jury Trial set for 3/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/15/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/23/2021. (GNB) ctp
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #10 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/22/2021. (GNB) ctp
September 7, 2021 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Meyer, Steven)
September 7, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #14 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Samra, Harout)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alexandra Garcia. (Meyer, Steven)
August 27, 2021 Filing 20 Joint RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to show cause filed by Alexandra Garcia. (Meyer, Steven) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (TNP).
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order, #10 Order to show cause by Alexandra Garcia. (Meyer, Steven)
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alexandra Garcia. Related case(s): No (Meyer, Steven)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER denying #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Regarding Plaintiff's request that the Court rule on the Motion for Remand before ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, the Court always resolves jurisdictional questions before substantive motions. Regarding Plaintiff's request for permission to amend her complaint in lieu of responding to the Motion to Dismiss should the Court deny her Motion to Remand, the Court does not stay other deadlines in a case pending the resolution of a motion. Moreover, Plaintiff calculates the deadline for her response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss incorrectly. Plaintiff's response was due on August 23, 2021, and requests for extensions of time filed on the deadline are disfavored. However, given the confusion surrounding the improperly filed Complaint and Notice of Removal, the Court will permit an extension of time for Plaintiff to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must respond on or before Friday, August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/24/2021. (CPH)
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Objection to Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Alexandra Garcia. (Meyer, Steven)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER vacating 13 Order on Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to reopen the Motion to Dismiss at Doc. #6. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/23/2021. (GNB) ctp
August 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alexandra Garcia. (Meyer, Steven)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint #7. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/20/2021. (JRR)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Samra, Harout)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic plc, Corporate Parent Covidien Holding Inc., Other Affiliate United States Surgical Corporation, Other Affiliate Newport Medical Instruments, Inc., Other Affiliate Sherwood Medical Company I, Other Affiliate Valleylab Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate VNUS Medical Technologies II, Inc., Other Affiliate VNUS Medical Technologies II, Inc., Other Affiliate Nellcor Puritan Bennett LLC, Other Affiliate Life Design Systems Inc., Other Affiliate MSCH LLC, Other Affiliate Covidien US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Batts, Inc., Other Affiliate Lazarus Effect, Inc. for Covidien LP; Corporate Parent Medtronic plc for Medtronic, Inc.. (Samra, Harout)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties have failed to comply with the Court's Order #3. The parties shall SHOW CAUSE and file their responses to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2021. (GNB) ctp
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER striking #8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Defendants have failed to include the required certification in accordance with Local Rule 3.03(b). Defendants are directed to refile the Certificate of Interested Persons within seven (7) days. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/13/2021. (GNB) ctp
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 (STRICKEN BY #9 ENDORSED ORDER) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. . (Samra, Harout) Modified on 8/16/2021 (RDO).
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 REFILED COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteenth Judicial Circuit of Florida, case number 052020CA010599XXXX filed in State Court on 1/5/2020. Filed by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Samra, Harout) Modified on 8/9/2021 (RDO). Modified on 8/23/2021 (GNB).
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Samra, Harout)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service (Covidien), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service (Medtronic), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint, #6 State Court Other Documents State Court - Other Documents)(Samra, Harout)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 7/28/2021. (JLE)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/27/2021. (GNB) ctp
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-1208-PGB-EJK. (SJB)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 (IMPROPERLY FILED. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED AND THEY WILL REFILE) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covidien LP and Medtronic, Inc. from 18th Judicial Circuit, case number 052020CA010599 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18517883 filed by All Defendants.(Samra, Harout) Modified on 7/30/2021 (RDO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Covidien LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Garcia
Represented By: Steven H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien LP
Represented By: Harout Samra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Harout Samra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?