Becker v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Bruce Becker
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv01301
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bruce Becker. (Wichmann, Lawana)
September 14, 2021 Filing 36 Member Case BRIEF by Bruce Becker. (Elias, Richard) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 35 BRIEF on Case Status in Becker by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Richard Milton Elias on behalf of Bruce Becker (Elias, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawana Sue Wichmann on behalf of Bruce Becker (Wichmann, Lawana)
September 14, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Gregory Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Joe)
September 13, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnston on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Grant)
September 13, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Reissaus on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Reissaus, Andrew)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. All motions pending as of the date of this Order are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties seeking relief should renew any motions by refiling them in the individual member cases or in the lead case as appropriate. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. Associated Cases: 6:21-md-03006-RBD-DAB et al.(BIA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (BIA).
August 16, 2021 Filing 27 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A Baker per Order at Doc. 2 in case 6:21-md-3006-RBD-DAB. New case number: 6:21-cv-01301-RBD-DAB. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 26 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 3006 Receipt of original record from the Western District of Washington, case number: 3:20-cv-05221-BHS. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:21-cv-01301-RBD-GJK. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-05221. File received electronically
August 12, 2021 Filing 24 MDL 3006 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 3006); in re Tasigna (Nilotinib) Products Liability Litigation; Middle District of Florida; assigned to Judge Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Email re CTO) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Bruce Becker, to #19 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Pl's Reply iso Motion to Stay)(Elias, Richard) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Grant Hollingsworth filed by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #19 MOTION to Stay (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE, by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, to #19 MOTION to Stay . (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 20 ERRATA Notice by Plaintiff Bruce Becker (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corrected Memo iso Mtn to Stay, #2 Supplement Corrected Declaration Supp Mtn to Stay)(Elias, Richard) Modified to add link to doc #19 on 7/1/2021 (AMD). [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Noting Date Set for 7/9/2021, re #19 MOTION to Stay. (AMD) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay , filed by Plaintiff Bruce Becker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay, #2 Supplement Memo In Supp of Motion, #3 Supplement Declaration Supp Motion, #4 Exhibit Ex A to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex B to Declaration)(Elias, Richard) Noting Date 7/9/2021. Modified on 6/28/2021 (AMD). [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *NINE DAY* Jury Trial is set for 3/1/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 7/27/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/23/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/22/2021, Motions due by 10/4/2021, Discovery completed by 11/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2021, Motions in Limine due by 1/24/2022, Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2022, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 2/8/2022, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 2/8/2022, Deposition Designations due by 2/8/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom E. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) re #16 Proposed Order. Signed Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 14. (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert E Johnston for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew L Reissaus for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Donald Robertson McMinn for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew L. Reissaus FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6368911 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Donald R. McMinn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6368897 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert E. Johnston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-6368872 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss Company whose shares are publicly traded on the SIX Swiss Exhange for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND Attorney Jennifer Campbell added to party Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation(pty:dft) by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation on 5/8/2020 (Elias, Richard) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard M Elias for Plaintiff Bruce Becker, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard M. Elias FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bruce Becker (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6226293 (Moore, Bradley) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/1/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/8/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6203828), filed by Bruce Becker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Moore, Bradley) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 11, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Becker
Represented By: Bradley Jerome Moore
Represented By: Richard M Elias
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Andrew L. Reissaus
Represented By: Donald R. McMinn
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Represented By: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Represented By: Grant Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?