Craig v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Debra Craig
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 6:2021cv01320
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David A Baker
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Debra Craig. (Wichmann, Lawana)
September 14, 2021 Filing 45 Member Case BRIEF by Debra Craig. (Elias, Richard) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 44 BRIEF on Case Status in Craig by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Johnston, Robert) Modified text on 9/15/2021 (TNP).
September 14, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Milton Elias on behalf of Debra Craig (Elias, Richard)
September 14, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawana Sue Wichmann on behalf of Debra Craig (Wichmann, Lawana)
September 14, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Gregory Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Joe)
September 13, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Reissaus on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Reissaus, Andrew)
September 13, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Johnston on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
September 13, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Hollingsworth on behalf of Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Hollingsworth, Grant)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. All motions pending as of the date of this Order are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Parties seeking relief should renew any motions by refiling them in the individual member cases or in the lead case as appropriate. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/31/2021. Associated Cases: 6:21-md-03006-RBD-DAB et al.(BIA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (BIA).
August 17, 2021 Filing 36 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A Baker per Order at Doc. 2 in case 6:21-md-3006-RBD-DAB. New case number: 6:21-cv-01320-RBD-DAB. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 35 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION member case. Master MDL case number: 3006 Receipt of original record from the Western District of Washington, case number: 2:20-cv-01641-TSZ. Assigned MDFL case number: 6:21-cv-01320-RBD-GJK. (ALL)
August 16, 2021 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01641. File received electronically
August 12, 2021 Filing 33 MDL 3006 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 3006); in re Tasigna (Nilotinib) Products Liability Litigation; Middle District of Florida; assigned to Judge Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Email regarding CTO) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #27 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this action are STAYED until further order of this Court. The parties are DIRECTED to promptly notify the Court of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's ruling on Plaintiff's pending motion to transfer this action. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Debra Craig, to #27 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Pl's Reply iso Motion to Stay)(Elias, Richard) Modified on 7/7/2021 (MW). [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Grant Hollingsworth filed by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation re #27 MOTION to Stay (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE, by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, to #27 MOTION to Stay . (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 28 ERRATA re #27 MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Debra Craig (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corrected Memo of Law iso Mtn to Stay, #2 Supplement Corrected Declaration Supp Mtn to Stay)(Elias, Richard) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Noting Date Set re #27 MOTION to Stay: Noting Date 7/9/2021 (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay , filed by Plaintiff Debra Craig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay, #2 Supplement Memo In Supp of Motion, #3 Supplement Declaration Supp Motion, #4 Exhibit Ex A to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex B to Declaration)(Elias, Richard) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
April 17, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE re filing of motion to transfer pursuant to 28: U.S.C. 1407 - In re: Tasinga Products Liability Litigation; filed by Plaintiff Debra Craig. (PM) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Joint Status Report ("JSR"), docket no. #20, the Court APPROVES the parties' Stipulated Protective Order, Ex. 1 to JSR. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 502(d) ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES: Jury Trial (2-3 weeks) is set for 1/30/2023 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2021, Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/1/2022, Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/13/2022, Discovery Motions due by 9/1/2022, Discovery to be completed by 9/30/2022, Dispositive motions due by 10/14/2022, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 11/17/2022, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/20/2022, Motions in Limine due by 12/29/2022, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2023, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 1/13/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 25, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Judge Thomas S. Zilly- Dep Clerk: Gail Glass; Pla Counsel: Bradley Moore and Richard Elias; Def Counsel: Grant Hollingsworth and Jennifer Campbell; CR: NONE; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m; Telephone Conference held on 3/25/2021. Counsel appear telephonically. The Court and counsel discuss the parties' Joint Status Report, docket no. #20. The Court hears from counsel as to the posture of the case. A 2-3 week jury trial is SET for January 30, 2023. A scheduling order will be issued.-Adjourned. (GG) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Joint Status Report, docket no. #20, the Court SETS a telephone conference for Thursday, March 25, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The Court's staff will be in contact with counsel to provide a conference call number and access code. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT and Discovery Plan by Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/1/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/15/2021. (SRS) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 1/19/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew L Reissaus for defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert E Johnston for defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Grant Hollingsworth for defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss Company whose shares are publicly traded on the SIX Swiss Exhange for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Campbell on behalf of Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew L. Reissaus FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6863770 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert E. Johnston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6863748 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Grant W. Hollingsworth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6863741 (Campbell, Jennifer) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation on 12/21/2020, filed by Plaintiff Debra Craig. (Elias, Richard) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard M Elias for Plaintiff Debra Craig, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard Elias FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Debra Craig (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6746901 (Moore, Bradley) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Debra Craig. (Moore, Bradley) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint - missing Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
November 6, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 3:20-cv-06090 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 2:20-cv-01641-JRC. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (GMR) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6718015), filed by Debra Craig. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Moore, Bradley) [Transferred from wawd on 8/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Craig
Represented By: Bradley Jerome Moore
Represented By: Richard M Elias
Represented By: Lawana Sue Wichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Andrew L. Reissaus
Represented By: Grant Hollingsworth
Represented By: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: Robert E. Johnston
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?